Plestsov et al v. GTS Transportation Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Denis Nazarov, Roman Kalabayda and Alexei Plestsov
Defendant: Tomas Stirbys and GTS TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv01847
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The deadline for the initial status report is extended to 6/4/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GTS Transportation Corporation, Tomas Stirbys by Jordan Kent Pack (Pack, Jordan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GTS Transportation Corporation, Tomas Stirbys by David L. Miller (Miller, David)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GTS Transportation Corporation, Tomas Stirbys by Cory D Anderson (Anderson, Cory)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GTS Transportation Corporation, Tomas Stirbys by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The parties shall file a joint initial status report by 5/14/20. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' This deadline supersedes any extensions granted by the court's General Order 20-0012. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
March 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants GTS Transportation Corporation, Tomas Stirbys (ecw, )
March 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Roman Kalabayda, Denis Nazarov, Alexei Plestsov by Julia Bikbova (Bikbova, Julia)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bikbova, Julia)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Alexei Plestsov, Roman Kalabayda, Denis Nazarov; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16860409.(Bikbova, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plestsov et al v. GTS Transportation Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Stirbys
Represented By: David L. Miller
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Represented By: Jordan Kent Pack
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTS TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Represented By: David L. Miller
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Connelly
Represented By: Jordan Kent Pack
Represented By: Cory D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Nazarov
Represented By: Julia Bikbova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Kalabayda
Represented By: Julia Bikbova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexei Plestsov
Represented By: Julia Bikbova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?