United States of America v. Sadig et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ATG Trust Company, as trustee of Trust Number L018-120, Cuu A. Lau, Cook County, Illinois, Bashar Sadig and Treasurer of Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2020cv01948
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court reviewed the Status Report (Dckt. No. #12 ), which stated that Plaintiff is in the process of effectuating service by September 7, 2020. The parties shall file a Joint Initial Status Report and submit a Word version of a proposed scheduling order by email by September 30, 2020. More information is available on Judge Seeger's webpage. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report by United States of America (Jones, Samuel)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court reviewed the Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Parties (Dckt. No. #10 ). The Treasurer of Cook County, Illinois is hereby substituted for Cook County, Illinois as a party. The Clerk's Office shall change the caption accordingly. The Treasurer of Cook County, Illinois is not required to file an answer or otherwise actively participate in this case pending further order of this Court. The Treasurer of Cook County, Illinois remains a party and is subject to discovery obligations, but is excused from initial disclosures (including the MIDP). Mailed notice (jjr, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Substitution and Involvement in Case (Jones, Samuel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. Cook County, Illinois waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Jones, Samuel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by United States of America. Bashar Sadig waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Jones, Samuel)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
March 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ATG Trust Company, as trustee of Trust Number L018-120, Cook County, Illinois, Cuu A. Lau, Bashar Sadig (tg, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED complaint by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Redline Copy)(Jones, Samuel)
March 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Samuel Patrick Jones (Jones, Samuel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Samuel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Jones, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sadig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG Trust Company, as trustee of Trust Number L018-120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuu A. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashar Sadig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Patrick Jones
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?