Oshana v. AER Lingus Limited
Plaintiff: Mary Oshana
Defendant: Aer Lingus Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv02041
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 6/2/2020 is stricken. Parties are directed to submit a joint written status report and a proposed discovery schedule by June 30, 2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mary Oshana. Aer Lingus Limited waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Hedrich, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/2/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hedrich, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mary Oshana; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16884539.(Hedrich, John)
March 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oshana v. AER Lingus Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Oshana
Represented By: John Francis Hedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aer Lingus Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?