Money et al v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: Carl Reed, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, Amber Watters, William Richard, James Money, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Patrice Daniels, Anthony Rodesky, Gerald Reed, Danny Wicker, Tim Walton, Kimberly Carter, Lucious Rogers, Adam Grunin, Andrew Hines, Lynwood Ellis, Lori Thompson, Eric Valdez, Adrian Torres, Carlton White, Shardon Gay, Antwan Freeman, Brittany Hall, Kimberly Dunteman, Anthony Buchanan and Willie Holloway
Defendant: Director of IDOC Rob Jeffreys, Governor J.B. Pritzker, Rob Jeffreys and J.B. Pritzker
Intervenor: Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2020cv02093
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: In light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint (Dckt. No. #48 ), the motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #44 ) is denied as moot. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 48 FIRST AMENDED complaint by William Richard, Danny Labosette, Gerald Reed, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Tewkunzi Green, Adrian Torres, Anthony Buchanan, Lori Thompson, Willie Holloway, Andrew Hines, Lucious Rogers, Kimberly Dunteman, Shardon Gay, Lynwood Ellis, Carlton White, Antwan Freeman, Brittany Hall, Eric Valdez, Adam Grunin, Kimberly Carter, Danny Wicker, Tim Walton against All Defendants and terminating Carl Reed, Anthony Rodesky (on behalf of themselves and all similarly situated individuals), Amber Watters, Patrice Daniels and James Money (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Del Valle, Vanessa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #44 ) is due on May 29, 2020. The reply brief is due on June 12, 2020. Defendants' motion for excess pages (Dckt. No. #46 ) is granted. This Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a response brief of up to 35 pages. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION by Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker for leave to file excess pages (Staley, Nicholas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM by Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #44 (Staley, Nicholas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker (Staley, Nicholas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James Money. J.B. Pritzker waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Grady, Sarah)
April 27, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James Money. Rob Jeffreys waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Grady, Sarah)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Intervenor Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins by Matthew John McQuaid (McQuaid, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020. Mailed notice.(jjr, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr., as emergency judge, on 4/10/2020: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction in Money v. Pritzker, Case No. 20-cv-2093 #9 is denied. Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file oversized brief #5 and for expedited treatment #12 in that same case are granted. Defendants' motion for leave to file sur-reply in that case #32 is granted. Petitioners' motion for expedited treatment in Money v. Jeffreys, Case No. 20-cv-2094 #3 is granted, but the Court denies Petitioners' request for expedited release. The petition #1 remains open on the docket, subject to further action by the parties and the judges, both assigned and emergency, as explained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order. No further status hearings will be set at this time by the emergency judge. Mailed notice(cdh, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Instanter (Dckt. No. #32 ) is granted. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 36 Defendants' Report on IDOC Releases, Population Reduction, and COVID-19 Cases by Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker (Shannon, Colleen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Carolyn E. Shapiro (Shapiro, Carolyn) (Linked document has incorrect case number - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 4/13/2020 (pk, ).
April 9, 2020 Filing 34 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker in Opposition to Modified Request for Emergency Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Robinson Declaration, #2 Exhibit Legislators' letter, #3 Exhibit Sweat Declaration)(Rees, R.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 33 Defendants' Report on IDOC Releases, Population Reduction, and COVID-19 Cases by Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker (Shannon, Colleen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker for leave to file Sur-Reply Instanter (Shannon, Colleen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This minute entry is issued by Judge Dow as designated emergency judge in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 and 20-cv-2094. In view of the comprehensive briefs and supporting materials and the need for expedited ruling, the Court has determined that a telephonic hearing will not be necessary and will issue a written ruling as soon as possible. The Court appreciates the extraordinary effort of counsel to provide high quality briefs on a highly compressed schedule. The Court notes Plaintiffs' offer to call as witnesses the individuals who submitted the declarations attached to the reply brief. [See docket entry 28 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 45.]. That will not be necessary, as the Court will accept as true for purposes of this hearing their representations in the declarations. Nor will it be necessary to make arrangements for the named Plaintiffs/Petitioners to either appear by phone or file their own declarations, as the Court also will accept as true for present purposes the accuracy of counsels' representations about the medical conditions of the named Plaintiffs/Petitioners. In order to ensure that the Court has accurate information on an admittedly moving target, the Court directs counsel for Defendants to submit by 5:00 pm today and by 2:00 p.m. on each subsequent day until a ruling is issued an update on (1) how many inmates have been released through each available vehicle and the total reduction in IDOC population since March 2 [see docket entry 26 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 3-4 and docket entry 28 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 7 & n.1] and (2) how many incarcerated individuals have confirmed cases of COVID-19 at (a) each institution where the named Plaintiffs are housed and (b) across the entire IDOC system. If the Court is unable to issue a decision by the close of business tomorrow, it does have the capability to issue a decision on the docket electronically over the weekend and will do so. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters to motion for temporary restraining order,,, motion for preliminary injunction,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mazur, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages [25 in Docket No. 20-cv-2093] is granted. Plaintiffs are also given leave to file an oversized reply brief on 4/8/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzkerin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters for temporary restraining order MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters for preliminary injunction #9 (Rees, R.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker for leave to file excess pages (Staley, Nicholas)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to motion for temporary restraining order,,, motion for preliminary injunction,, #9 Submission Regarding Applicability and Effect of 18 U.S.C. 3626 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mazur, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Stephen H. Weil (Weil, Stephen)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This matter is before Judge Dow as emergency judge. Consistent with the order entered by Judge Kennelly in Case No. 20-cv-2134, the Court enters the following supplemental briefing order in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 & 20-cv-2094: By 12:00 p.m. on 4/6/2020, Plaintiffs are directed to supplement their TRO/PI motion to provide their position regarding the applicability and effect of 18 U.S.C. 3626 to each lawsuit and, in particular, to the relief they are requesting in the TRO/PI motion. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM of law in support of defendant-intervenor by Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins motion by Intervenor Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins to intervene individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated victims of violent crimes.(pk, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION by Intervenor Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins to intervene individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated victims of violent crimes. (pk, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker by Colleen Marie Shannon (Shannon, Colleen)
April 3, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker by Nicholas Scott Staley (Staley, Nicholas)
April 3, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rob Jeffreys, J.B. Pritzker by R. Douglas Rees (Rees, R.)
April 3, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon further review of the materials filed to date in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 and 20-cv-2094, it appears that in their request for immediate relief, Plaintiffs ask the Court to "preliminarily certify Plaintiffs' proposed subclasses 1 and 2, and order Defendants to transfer [certain] individuals to their homes to self-isolate via a temporary medical furlough." [91, at 70-71.] The Court draws to counsel's attention the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, which (among other things) restrict the circumstances in which a court may enter an order "that has the purpose or effect of reducing or limiting the prison population." 18 U.S.C. 3626(g)(4); see also Brown v. Plata, 563 U.S. 493 (2011). The Court requests that in their briefs the parties give careful attention to whether the PLRA applies to these cases.Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Alan S. Mills (Mills, Alan)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Nicole Rae Schult (Schult, Nicole)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry: This order is entered by Judge Dow as the designated emergency judge and will also be entered on the regular docket in (1) Money, et al. v. Pritzker, et al., No. 20cv2093, assigned to Judge Seeger, and (2) Money, et al. v. Jeffreys, et al., No. 20cv2094, assigned to Judge Kness, and pertains only to the emergency motions filed on the docket in the special docket, In re: Emergency Motions During Coronavirus COVID-19 Public Emergency, No. 20cv1792. All other motions will be handled by the assigned judges in due course. Plaintiffs' emergency motion for TRO or preliminary injunction in Case No. 20cv2093 91 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' request for expedited treatment in Case No. 20cv2093 92 and Petitioners' request for expedited treatment in Case No. 20cv2094 93 are granted. Expedited briefing is ordered as follows: Defendants' brief is due on 4/6/2020 by 5pm; Plaintiffs' reply is due on 4/8/2020 by 5pm. In their response brief, Defendants may address any issues they would like relating to the requests for relief under Section 1983 and habeas, but are requested to give special attention to explaining exactly what measures, if any, are currently being taken in Illinois "to protect people in prisons from the impending spread of COVID-19 by releasing people in an effort to reduce populations" [See 91, at 33; see also id. at 33-39 (describing efforts by state and county governments to reduce prison population, particularly for those who are more vulnerable, close to completing their sentences and/or whose release is deemed to be less dangerous to the community)]. In their reply, Plaintiffs may address any issues they would like, but are requested to give special attention to the citation of any authority or precedent for a federal court order directing state officials to release large numbers of incarcerated individuals. [See 91, at 59-60 (citing Thaker, et al. v. Doll, et al., No. 20 C 0480, Dkt. 47 (M.D. Pa. Mar. 31, 2020), and indicating that in that case the court "granted a temporary restraining order requiring the immediate release of 11 prisoners in federal custody who suffer from chronic medical conditions and face a serious threat of injury or death if exposed to COVID-19")]. After reviewing the briefs, the Court will either issue a ruling by mail or set the matter for telephonic hearing. If a telephonic hearing will be held, it likely would take place on 4/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. and the Court would provide the call-in information. All additional filings on this motion must be made in the emergency docket, No. 20-cv-1792, and in the underlying dockets as well. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Elizabeth N. Mazur (Mazur, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff James Money to expedite hearing on motion for TRO and/or preliminary injunction (Reed, Samantha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Samantha Reed (Reed, Samantha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Amanda C Antholt (Antholt, Amanda)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters for temporary restraining order , MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Grady, Sarah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters to certify class Responses due by 4/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bedi, Sheila)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Vanessa Del Valle (Del Valle, Vanessa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Sheila A Bedi (Bedi, Sheila)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters for leave to file excess pages in support of their requests for an emergency temporary restraining order and for class certification (Grady, Sarah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Jennifer Soble (Soble, Jennifer)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Sarah Copeland Grady (Grady, Sarah)
April 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Del Valle, Vanessa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Danny Labosette, Gerald Reed, Carl Reed, Patrice Daniels, William Richard, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters, James Money, Anthony Rodesky, Tewkunzi Green; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16904711. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Del Valle, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Money et al v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Reed
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tewkunzi Green
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Labosette
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Watters
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Money
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl "Tay Tay" Tate
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Daniels
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodesky
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Reed
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Carolyn E. Shapiro
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Wicker
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Walton
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Carter
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucious Rogers
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Grunin
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hines
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynwood Ellis
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Thompson
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Valdez
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Torres
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton White
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shardon Gay
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Freeman
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Hall
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dunteman
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Buchanan
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Holloway
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of IDOC Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor J.B. Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Colleen Marie Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Staley
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Pritzker
Represented By: Colleen Marie Shannon
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Staley
Represented By: R. Douglas Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jennifer Bishop-Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew John McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?