Money et al v. Jeffreys
Plaintiff: Carl Reed, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, Amber Watters, William Richard, James Money, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Patrice Daniels, Anthony Rodesky and Gerald Reed
Defendant: Director of IDOC Rob Jeffreys
Case Number: 1:2020cv02094
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL CASES. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr., as emergency judge, on 4/10/2020: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction in Money v. Pritzker, Case No. 20-cv-2093 #9 is denied. Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file oversized brief #5 and for expedited treatment #12 in that same case are granted. Defendants' motion for leave to file sur-reply in that case #32 is granted. Petitioners' motion for expedited treatment in Money v. Jeffreys, Case No. 20-cv-2094 #3 is granted, but the Court denies Petitioners' request for expedited release. The petition #1 remains open on the docket, subject to further action by the parties and the judges, both assigned and emergency, as explained in the Memorandum Opinion and Order. No further status hearings will be set at this time by the emergency judge. Mailed notice(cdh, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS Report by Rob Jeffreys (Doersch, Katherine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 STATUS Report by Rob Jeffreys (Doersch, Katherine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rob Jeffreys by Katherine Marie Doersch (Doersch, Katherine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This minute entry is issued by Judge Dow as designated emergency judge in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 and 20-cv-2094. In view of the comprehensive briefs and supporting materials and the need for expedited ruling, the Court has determined that a telephonic hearing will not be necessary and will issue a written ruling as soon as possible. The Court appreciates the extraordinary effort of counsel to provide high quality briefs on a highly compressed schedule. The Court notes Plaintiffs' offer to call as witnesses the individuals who submitted the declarations attached to the reply brief. [See docket entry 28 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 45.]. That will not be necessary, as the Court will accept as true for purposes of this hearing their representations in the declarations. Nor will it be necessary to make arrangements for the named Plaintiffs/Petitioners to either appear by phone or file their own declarations, as the Court also will accept as true for present purposes the accuracy of counsels' representations about the medical conditions of the named Plaintiffs/Petitioners. In order to ensure that the Court has accurate information on an admittedly moving target, the Court directs counsel for Defendants to submit by 5:00 pm today and by 2:00 p.m. on each subsequent day until a ruling is issued an update on (1) how many inmates have been released through each available vehicle and the total reduction in IDOC population since March 2 [see docket entry 26 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 3-4 and docket entry 28 in Case No. 20-cv-2093, at 7 & n.1] and (2) how many incarcerated individuals have confirmed cases of COVID-19 at (a) each institution where the named Plaintiffs are housed and (b) across the entire IDOC system. If the Court is unable to issue a decision by the close of business tomorrow, it does have the capability to issue a decision on the docket electronically over the weekend and will do so. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY by Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters to Response #18 , PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Danny Labosette, Gerald Reed, Carl Reed, Patrice Daniels, William Richard, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters, James Money, Anthony Rodesky, Tewkunzi Green against Rob Jeffreys Filing fee #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New York Times Report, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Kaney, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Prof. Judith Resnik, #4 Exhibit Executive Order 2020-19, #5 Exhibit Declarations from Petitioners' Families)(Soble, Jennifer)
April 7, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Alan S. Mills (Mills, Alan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Nicole Rae Schult (Schult, Nicole)
April 6, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages [149 in Docket No. 20-cv-1792; 19 in Docket No. 20-cv-2094] is granted. Petitioners are also given leave to file an oversized reply brief on 4/8/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 20 STATE Court Record by Rob Jeffreys (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Kashyap, Gopi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Rob Jeffreys for leave to file excess pages (Kashyap, Gopi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Defendant Rob Jeffreys to petition for writ of habeas corpus,, #1 , supplement #17 (Kashyap, Gopi)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to petition for writ of habeas corpus,, #1 Submission Regarding Applicability and Effect of 18 U.S.C. 3626 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mazur, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This matter is before Judge Dow as emergency judge. Consistent with the order entered by Judge Kennelly in Case No. 20-cv-2134, the Court enters the following supplemental briefing order in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 & 20-cv-2094: By 12:00 p.m. on 4/6/2020, Plaintiffs are directed to supplement their TRO/PI motion to provide their position regarding the applicability and effect of 18 U.S.C. 3626 to each lawsuit and, in particular, to the relief they are requesting in the TRO/PI motion. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: This matter is before Judge Dow as emergency judge. Consistent with the order entered by Judge Kennelly in Case No. 20-cv-2134, the Court enters the following supplemental briefing order in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 & 20-cv-2094: By 12:00 p.m. on 4/6/2020, Plaintiffs are directed to supplement their TRO/PI motion to provide their position regarding the applicability and effect of 18 U.S.C. 3626 to each lawsuit and, in particular, to the relief they are requesting in the TRO/PI motion. Mailed notice(cdh, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rob Jeffreys by Gopi Kashyap (Kashyap, Gopi)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon further review of the materials filed to date in Case Nos. 20-cv-2093 and 20-cv-2094, it appears that in their request for immediate relief, Plaintiffs ask the Court to "preliminarily certify Plaintiffs' proposed subclasses 1 and 2, and order Defendants to transfer [certain] individuals to their homes to self-isolate via a temporary medical furlough." [91, at 70-71.] The Court draws to counsel's attention the provisions of the Prison Litigation Reform Act, which (among other things) restrict the circumstances in which a court may enter an order "that has the purpose or effect of reducing or limiting the prison population." 18 U.S.C. 3626(g)(4); see also Brown v. Plata, 563 U.S. 493 (2011). The Court requests that in their briefs the parties give careful attention to whether the PLRA applies to these cases. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry: This order is entered by Judge Dow as the designated emergency judge and will also be entered on the regular docket in (1) Money, et al. v. Pritzker, et al., No. 20cv2093, assigned to Judge Seeger, and (2) Money, et al. v. Jeffreys, et al., No. 20cv2094, assigned to Judge Kness, and pertains only to the emergency motions filed on the docket in the special docket, In re: Emergency Motions During Coronavirus COVID-19 Public Emergency, No. 20cv1792. All other motions will be handled by the assigned judges in due course. Plaintiffs' emergency motion for TRO or preliminary injunction in Case No. 20cv2093 91 is taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' request for expedited treatment in Case No. 20cv2093 92 and Petitioners' request for expedited treatment in Case No. 20cv2094 93 are granted. Expedited briefing is ordered as follows: Defendants' brief is due on 4/6/2020 by 5pm; Plaintiffs' reply is due on 4/8/2020 by 5pm. In their response brief, Defendants may address any issues they would like relating to the requests for relief under Section 1983 and habeas, but are requested to give special attention to explaining exactly what measures, if any, are currently being taken in Illinois "to protect people in prisons from the impending spread of COVID-19 by releasing people in an effort to reduce populations" [See 91, at 33; see also id. at 33-39 (describing efforts by state and county governments to reduce prison population, particularly for those who are more vulnerable, close to completing their sentences and/or whose release is deemed to be less dangerous to the community)]. In their reply, Plaintiffs may address any issues they would like, but are requested to give special attention to the citation of any authority or precedent for a federal court order directing state officials to release large numbers of incarcerated individuals. [See 91, at 59-60 (citing Thaker, et al. v. Doll, et al., No. 20 C 0480, Dkt. 47 (M.D. Pa. Mar. 31, 2020), and indicating that in that case the court "granted a temporary restraining order requiring the immediate release of 11 prisoners in federal custody who suffer from chronic medical conditions and face a serious threat of injury or death if exposed to COVID-19")]. After reviewing the briefs, the Court will either issue a ruling by mail or set the matter for telephonic hearing. If a telephonic hearing will be held, it likely would take place on 4/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. and the Court would provide the call-in information. All additional filings on this motion must be made in the emergency docket, No. 20-cv-1792, and in the underlying dockets as well. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters (Del Valle, Vanessa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Elizabeth N. Mazur (Mazur, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff-petitioners have this day filed their "Emergency Petition for Writs of Habeas Corpus," along with a motion styled "Petitioners' Motion for an Expedited Hearing on Emergency Petition for Writs of Habeas Corpus." Under Paragraph Three of Second Amended General Order 20-0012 ("In re: Coronavirus COVID-19 Public Emergency"), available on the Court's website ( www.ilnd.uscourts.gov ), all civil case hearings on or before May 1, 2020 are stricken and will be reset to a date on or after May 4, 2020. As a result, and in the light of the Emergency Petition, the Court construes Petitioners' Motion for an Expedited Hearing as seeking emergency relief. Counsel is thus directed to Paragraphs Five and Six of the Second Amended General Order, which provide for situations in which a party seeks emergency relief: "Any party may seek emergency relief in any case.... In addition to filing the emergency motion in the case in which emergency relief is sought, the party must file the motion in Case No. 20-cv-01792, which is a docket created to receive emergency motions filed under this Second Amended General Order. The emergency motion must be filed (i) electronically via CM/ECF if possible.... The emergency motion will be considered as soon as practicable by the presiding judge, an emergency judge, or the Chief Judge." Accordingly, to the extent they are in fact seeking emergency relief, Petitioners must comply with the procedure for emergency relief set forth in the Court's Second Amended General Order. Mailed notice (ef, ) Modified on 4/2/2020 (tg, ). Modified on 4/2/2020 (tg, ).
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Amanda C Antholt (Antholt, Amanda)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Sheila A Bedi (Bedi, Sheila)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Samantha Reed (Reed, Samantha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Vanessa Del Valle (Del Valle, Vanessa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Jennifer Soble (Soble, Jennifer)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard for hearing re PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Danny Labosette, Gerald Reed, Carl Reed, Patrice Daniels, William Richard, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters, James Money, Anthony Rodesky, Tewkunzi Green against Rob Jeffreys Filing fee #1 (Del Valle, Vanessa)
April 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Patrice Daniels, Tewkunzi Green, Danny Labosette, James Money, Carl Reed, Gerald Reed, William Richard, Anthony Rodesky, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters by Sarah Copeland Grady (Grady, Sarah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Danny Labosette, Gerald Reed, Carl Reed, Patrice Daniels, William Richard, Carl "Tay Tay" Tate, Amber Watters, James Money, Anthony Rodesky, Tewkunzi Green against Rob Jeffreys Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-16904831. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Del Valle, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Money et al v. Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Reed
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tewkunzi Green
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Labosette
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Watters
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Money
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl "Tay Tay" Tate
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Daniels
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodesky
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Reed
Represented By: Amanda C Antholt
Represented By: Jennifer Soble
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mazur
Represented By: Sarah Copeland Grady
Represented By: Samantha Reed
Represented By: Sheila A Bedi
Represented By: Vanessa Del Valle
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of IDOC Rob Jeffreys
Represented By: Katherine Marie Doersch
Represented By: Gopi Kashyap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?