Barrett v. Henry Stone Music USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pastor Thomas L. Barrett, Jr. and Thomas L. Barrett, Jr.
Defendant: Henry Stone Music USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02153
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #11 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dal, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff (O'toole, Nicole)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas L. Barrett, Jr by Nicole O'toole (O'toole, Nicole)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas L. Barrett, Jr by Jeffrey Scott Becker (Becker, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ecw, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ecw, )
April 6, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Henry Stone Music USA, Inc. (ng, )
April 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Becker, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Thomas L. Barrett, Jr; 1,000,000.00. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Becker, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Henry Stone Music USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Stone Music USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pastor Thomas L. Barrett, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Barrett, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole O'toole
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?