Fifth Third Bank, National Association v. 1 Energy Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Defendant: 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Jing Jing a/k/a Jerry Yu, Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu and Jerry Yu
Case Number: 1:2020cv02194
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing previously set for 6/16/2021 is stricken and reset to 7/20/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 7/15/2021 the parties shall file a joint status report with updates on discovery. The parties shall also state in the joint status report whether they are interested in having a settlement conference with the Court. The Court has reviewed the parties' latest status reports [60, 63]. The parties report that they have issued all written discovery requests and deposition notices, and that they will be taking 5 depositions before the close of fact discovery. Fact discovery close date of 7/9/21 stands. Mailed notice (lxs, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: As represented in the reply brief #61 , the parties meet and confer session has resolved the pending dispute. Plaintiff's motion to compel #55 is denied as moot. Defendant Li is ordered to supplement its interrogatory answers and responses to document requests by 6/16/21 and to produce additional documents by 6/21/21, as represented in the reply brief. Mailed notice (lxs, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 62 STATUS Report and Statement of Agreement by 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu (Smith, J.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 61 REPLY by Fifth Third Bank, National Association to reply to response to motion #58 to Compel Directed at Defendant Franco Li (Beideman, Mackenzie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 60 STATUS Report by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: The Court has reviewed Defendant Franco Li's response brief #58 . The parties are ordered to meet and confer by telephone or videoconference as Defendant claims it has produced all requested documents. The parties shall meet and attempt to resolve this dispute by 6/10/21. Plaintiff's reply brief, due on 6/14/21, shall either provide a basis as to why the dispute has not been resolved or inform the Court that the motion to compel is now moot. Mailed notice (lxs, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 58 REPLY by Franco Li to MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association to compel Defendant Franco Li #55 (Smith, J.)
June 1, 2021 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Admissions by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
May 26, 2021 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Franco Li #55 shall be briefed as follows: Defendant's response is due by 6/7/2021; reply brief is due 6/14/2021. Mailed notice (lxs, )
May 25, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association to compel Defendant Franco Li (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Beideman, Mackenzie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Third Set of Requests for Admission by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
May 3, 2021 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing previously set for 5/5/2021 is stricken and reset to 6/16/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 6/10/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report with updates on discovery and any settlement discussions. The Court has reviewed the parties' latest status report #52 . The parties state that they have exchanged written discovery requests and deposition notices and anticipate meeting the new 5/30/2021 deadline for all written discovery requests and deposition notices. The parties are reminded that fact discovery will close on 7/9/2021. Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 52 STATUS Report (Joint) by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Plaintiff's joint motion to extend the discovery schedule #50 is granted in part and denied in part. The parties have already requested two discovery extensions [44, 48], and this is now the third. The parties are cautioned that they should move through discovery faster and resolve their disputes more efficiently. The fact discovery close date remains at 7/9/21 because the parties have not demonstrated good cause they need an extension of this date with over two months left in discovery. However, the Court will extend the deadline to issue all written discovery and notice of depositions with agreed upon dates to 5/30/21. Mailed notice (lxs, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association for extension of time to complete discovery JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE (Beideman, Mackenzie)
March 29, 2021 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Plaintiff's joint motion for extension of time to complete written discovery #48 is granted. The deadline to issue written discovery and notice of depositions with agreed upon dates is extended to 5/14/21. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 26, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association for extension of time to complete discovery Joint Motion to Extend Written Discovery (Beideman, Mackenzie)
March 8, 2021 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing previously set for 3/11/2021 is stricken and reset to 5/5/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 4/29/2021 the parties shall file a joint status report with updates on discovery and any settlement discussions. Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing previously set for 1/11/2021 is stricken and reset to 3/11/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 1/5/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report with updates on discovery and any settlement discussions. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #45 . The parties report that they have exchanged initial written discovery requests but require additional time for discovery, as spelled out in their joint motion to extend the discovery schedule #44 . In that motion, the parties explain that the high volume of potentially responsive documents, as well as delays caused by COVID-19, have led to the need for more time to complete discovery. Finding good cause, the Court grants the parties' motion to extend the discovery schedule #44 , and adopts their requested dates. All written discovery shall be completed by 3/31/2021; deposition notices shall be issued by 4/30/2021; and fact discovery will close on 7/9/2021. Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
January 5, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association for extension of time to complete discovery Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule (Beideman, Mackenzie)
November 9, 2020 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing previously set for 11/10/2020 is stricken and reset to 1/11/2021 at 9:15 a.m. By 1/6/2021 the parties shall file a joint status report with updates on discovery and settlement discussions. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #42 . The parties state that they are progressing with discovery and do not request a settlement conference at this time. Mailed notice (lxs, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 42 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
November 3, 2020 Filing 41 certificate of service of defendants first set of written discovery requests to plaintiff by 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li (Smith, J.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Service First Set of Written Discovery to Jing Jing Yu by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
November 2, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiff's First Set of Written Discovery to Franco Li by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
November 2, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Service First Set of Written Discovery to 1 Energy Solutions by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Beideman, Mackenzie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association to motion for more definite statement #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Beideman, Mackenzie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Defendants 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu to Plaintiff's Motion for More Definite Statement (Smith, J.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing set for 9/10/2020 is stricken and reset to 11/10/2020 at 9:15 a.m. by telephone. By 11/5/2020, the parties shall file a joint status report with an update on discovery and settlement discussions. All written discovery shall be completed by 1/15/2021. Deposition notices with agreed upon dates shall be issued by 2/19/2021. As ordered by the district judge, all fact discovery shall be completed by 4/28/2021. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion for more definite statement #33 is taken under advisement. The defendants' response is due 9/9/20. Plaintiff's reply is due 9/16/20. Mailed notice (air, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Associationfor more definite statement (Beideman, Mackenzie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Beideman, Mackenzie)
August 28, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association by Mackenzie Franklin Beideman (Beideman, Mackenzie)
August 10, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Franco Li against All Defendants . by Franco Li(Smith, J.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendants' agreed motion to file amended answer and counterclaims #28 is granted. The defendants shall filed the amended answer and counterclaims on or before August 10, 2020. In light of the motion, the plaintiff's motion for more definite statement #25 is denied without prejudice and the accompanying briefing schedule is stricken. Mailed notice (air, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Allow Defendants to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion)(Smith, J.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by J. Mark Smith of Change of Address and Law Firm (Smith, J.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The plaintiff's motion for more definite statement #25 is taken under advisement. The defendants' response is due 7/21/20. Plaintiff's reply is due 7/28/20. Mailed notice (air, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Associationfor more definite statement (Dahl, James)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Telephonic status hearing set for 9/10/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call via web link that will identify them as counsel of record and allow the necessary permissions to address the Court. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing but will be placed on mute. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 7354516. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (lxs, )
July 1, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for further discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference. (air, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference and discovery scheduling and supervision.(air, )Mailed notice. Modified on 6/30/2020 (air, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The court has reviewed the initial status report #20 . MIDP responses are due 8/28/20 and fact discovery will close on 4/28/21. Further discovery scheduling and supervision are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge; the referral includes authority to conduct any settlement conference(s) the parties may request.Mailed notice (air, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Bonadies, Paul)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association by Paul Nickolas Bonadies (Bonadies, Paul)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Jing Jing Yu, Franco Li, 1 Energy Solutions, Inc. against Fifth Third Bank, National Association . by Jing Jing Yu, Franco Li, 1 Energy Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Affiliates)(Smith, J.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendants' agreed motion for extension #16 is granted. The defendants' answer is now due on or before 6/22/20. Mailed notice (air, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Smith, J.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu by Connor Tyler Gants (Gants, Connor)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu by William Scott Porterfield (Porterfield, William)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Attorney J. Mark Smith's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Counsel is directed to file his appearance on behalf of the defendants. Mailed notice (air, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: On the Court's own motion, the initial status conference set for 6/2/20 is stricken. The parties are to file another status report by on 6/29/20. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Mailed notice (air, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17058037. (Smith, J.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report by Fifth Third Bank, National Association (Dahl, James)
May 7, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Jing Jing Yu. (ng, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 6/2/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 5/26/20. Mailed notice (air, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association as to Franco Li on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Dahl, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association as to 1 Energy Solutions, Inc. on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Dahl, James)
April 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 1 Energy Solutions, Inc., Franco Li, Jing Jing Yu. (ng, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
April 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fifth Third Bank, National Association by James E. Dahl (Dahl, James)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dahl, James)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16919473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dahl, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank, National Association v. 1 Energy Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Represented By: James E. Dahl
Represented By: Paul Nickolas Bonadies
Represented By: Mackenzie Franklin Beideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Energy Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Smith
Represented By: Connor Tyler Gants
Represented By: William Scott Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jing Jing a/k/a Jerry Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franco Li
Represented By: J. Mark Smith
Represented By: Connor Tyler Gants
Represented By: William Scott Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jing Jing Yu
Represented By: J. Mark Smith
Represented By: Connor Tyler Gants
Represented By: William Scott Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Yu
Represented By: J. Mark Smith
Represented By: Connor Tyler Gants
Represented By: William Scott Porterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?