Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC v. MG Management CO., LLC et al
Petitioner: Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC
Respondent: MG Management CO., LLC, Matthew Goforth, Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC and Malinda Goforth
Case Number: 1:2020cv02207
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: For the telephonic initial status hearing on July 17, 2020, counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/3/2020: Based on a review of the docket, it appears that no Defendant has yet answered the complaint. Given the various extensions of deadlines effected by recent District-wide general orders, it may be unclear to Defendants when they must respond to the complaint. For the sake of clarity and to ensure efficiency, the Court orders that defendants shall answer the complaint on or before June 19, 2020. Telephonic initial status hearing set for July 17, 2020 at 10:15 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. Mailed notice(ef, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to MG Management CO., LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Matthew Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC as to Malinda Goforth on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (Grow, Allison)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL CASES. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 4/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Respondents Malinda Goforth, Matthew Goforth, MG Management CO., LLC, Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC. (ng, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (td, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Stephen C. Jarvis (Jarvis, Stephen)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC Petitioner's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Grow, Allison)
April 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC by Allison Renee Grow (Grow, Allison)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grow, Allison)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Confirm Interim Award of Injunctive Relief filed by Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16920027. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order on Renewed Motion for Interim Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Award on Appeal)(Grow, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC v. MG Management CO., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MG Management CO., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Malinda's Sugar & Spice, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Malinda Goforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sears Authorized Hometown Stores, LLC
Represented By: Stephen C. Jarvis
Represented By: Allison Renee Grow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?