The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 et al v. Flagstad et al
Plaintiff: The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 and Folding Light, LLC
Defendant: Oxford GP, LLC, Financial Freedom Advisors, LLC, Oxford Media, LLC, Cloverpoint Partners, LLC, Oxford FG, LLC, Brock H Flagstad, Oxford Marketing Partners, LLC and Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02242
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: By 6/16/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Oxford Tax Partners, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Oxford Media, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Oxford Marketing Partners, LLC on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Oxford GP, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Oxford FG, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Financial Freedom Advisors, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Cloverpoint Partners, LLC on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 as to Brock H Flagstad on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Kane, William)
April 13, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cloverpoint Partners, LLC, Financial Freedom Advisors, LLC, Brock H Flagstad, Oxford FG, LLC, Oxford GP, LLC, Oxford Marketing Partners, LLC, Oxford Media, LLC, Oxford Tax Partners, LLC. (ng, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
April 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 by David Mitchell Poell (Poell, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 by William Kevin Kane (Kane, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Damages, and Appointment of Receiver filed by Folding Light, LLC, The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16923363. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kane, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002 et al v. Flagstad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Freedom Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloverpoint Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford FG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock H Flagstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Marketing Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Tax Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The James Streibich Revocable Trust of 2002
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: David Mitchell Poell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Folding Light, LLC
Represented By: William Kevin Kane
Represented By: David Mitchell Poell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?