Harris-Norvell v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kim Harris-Norvell
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Quicken Loans, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02327
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Kim Harris-Norvell. (Kosla, Taylor)
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Cantor, Jules)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #21 , the claims against Quicken Loans, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Quicken Loans, LLC terminated. Mailed notice. (dal, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kim Harris-Norvell as to Quicken Loans, only. (Kosla, Taylor)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Kim Harris-Norvell of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant, Trans Union, LLC (Kosla, Taylor)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Cantor, Jules)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Cantor, Jules)
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Jules Harrison Cantor (Cantor, Jules)
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: It has been brought to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's notice of settlement #14 relates to the claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, only. As Plaintiff intends to litigate the claims against the other Defendants, the Court's order dated 5/1/2020 #15 is modified as follows: The 28-day extension of deadlines in Third Amended General Order 20-0012 applies to Defendants' answers. Accordingly, Transunion LLC's answer will be due 6/8/2020, and Quicken Loans LLC's and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s answers will be due 6/9/2020. By 7/1/2020, the parties shall conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and file a joint initial status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. The status hearing previously set for 8/5/2020 at 9:00 AM shall stand unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Mailed notice. (dal, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement #14 , the parties will not be required to file the status report required by paragraph 5 of Third Amended General Order 20-0012. Instead, by 7/1/2020, Plaintiff shall either file a notice of voluntary dismissal or a status report updating the Court regarding the status of the settlement. The initial status hearing set for 7/1/2020 #5 is stricken. Status hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Kim Harris-Norvell of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant, Equifax Information Services, LLC (Kosla, Taylor)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Harris-Norvell as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Kosla, Taylor)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Harris-Norvell as to Quicken Loans, LLC on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Kosla, Taylor)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Harris-Norvell as to Trans Union, LLC on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Kosla, Taylor)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Harris-Norvell as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Kosla, Taylor)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union, LLC by Daniel Owen Halvorsen (Halvorsen, Daniel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Trans Union, LLC by Scott Edwin Brady (Brady, Scott)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 7/1/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 15, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Quicken Loans, LLC, and Trans Union, LLC. (acm, )
April 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kim Harris-Norvell by Michael S. Agruss (Agruss, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kim Harris-Norvell by Taylor Leigh Kosla (Kosla, Taylor)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kim Harris-Norvell; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16933710. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kosla, Taylor)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris-Norvell v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Owen Halvorsen
Represented By: Scott Edwin Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jules Harrison Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Harris-Norvell
Represented By: Taylor Leigh Kosla
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?