Kesberg v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Jewel Y. Kesberg
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation and THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02353
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties shall file a joint written status report by 6/30/2020. A status hearing is set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The order of this court shall stand notwithstanding the extension of time granted by General Order 20-0012 of the Executive Committee of this court as amended 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties shall file a joint written status report by 6/30/2020. A status hearing is set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The order of this court shall stand notwithstanding the extension of time granted by General Order 20-0012 of the Executive Committee of this court as amended 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties shall file a joint written status report by 6/30/2020. A status hearing is set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The order of this court shall stand notwithstanding the extension of time granted by General Order 20-0012 of the Executive Committee of this court as amended 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (ags)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jewel Y. Kesberg. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jewel Y. Kesberg. Rosemount Aerospace, Inc. waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jewel Y. Kesberg. Boeing Company, The waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 16, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jewel Y. Kesberg by John Vasilios Kalantzis (Kalantzis, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jewel Y. Kesberg by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jewel Y. Kesberg by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jewel Y. Kesberg by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT SHORT FORM AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT filed by Jewel Y. Kesberg; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16935931.(Clifford, Robert)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesberg v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Y. Kesberg
Represented By: John Vasilios Kalantzis
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?