Hernandez v. Walgreen Company
Plaintiff: Laura Hernandez
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02434
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #20 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The dismissal pertains only to Plaintiff's claims, not to that of the putative class. The status hearing set for 6/30/2020 #16 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Laura Hernandez without Prejudice (Malmstrom, Carl)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Walgreen Company (Galibois, Michael)
May 28, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 5/26/2020 order #16 is amended to provide that the deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 6/25/2020. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted.The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 6/18/2020. Motion hearing set for 5/27/2020 #13 is stricken. Plaintiff need not file a status report regarding service. The status hearing set for 6/8/2020 #6 is stricken and re-set for 6/30/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Company by Kristen Annemarie DeGrande (DeGrande, Kristen)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Michael C. O'Neil for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (O'Neil, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Walgreen Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (O'Neil, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Company by Michael C. O'Neil (O'Neil, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walgreen Company by Michael Brian Galibois (Galibois, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laura Hernandez as to Walgreen Company on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Malmstrom, Carl)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The jurisdictional addendum #8 having established, at least for pleading purposes, the minimal diversity required by CAFA, the order to show cause #4 is discharged. By 6/4/2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report regarding the progress, if any, on serving summons.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Jurisdictional Addendum and Response to Court's Show Cause Order by Laura Hernandez (Malmstrom, Carl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Pursuant to Paragraph 2.c of Third Amended General Order 20-0012, the time for Plaintiff to comply with the 4/22/2020 order #4 is extended to 5/28/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of Third Amended General Order 20-0012, the 5/11/2020 status hearing #4 is stricken and re-set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 a.m. If any party would like that the hearing to be held in May 2020, the party should file a motion under Paragraph 3 of the Third Amended General Order. If any party wishes to present any other procedural issue or question to the court, the party should send an email to the Courtroom Deputy (Jackie_Deanes@ilnd.uscourts.gov) and the proposed order email box (Proposed_Order_Feinerman@ilnd.uscourts.gov), with a copy to all other counsel, and the court will respond as soon as practicable. If any party wishes to extend, shorten, or revoke in a particular case an extension granted by Paragraph 2 of the Third Amended General Order or any prior iteration of General Order 20-0012, the party should file a motion on the case docket pursuant to Paragraph 2.c of the Third Amended General Order, and shall indicate in the motion whether the relief sought is agreed or opposed. Parties may file non-emergency motions on the case docket as they see fit. Emergency relief in any case, or emergency relief from the Third Amended General Order, shall be sought in the manner set forth in Paragraphs 7-8 of the Third Amended General Order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 5/7/2020 why this case should not be dismissed for want of subject matter jurisdiction. The complaint premises jurisdiction on the Class Action Fairness Act, but it does not properly allege the citizenship of Defendant. Plaintiff may show cause by filing a Jurisdictional Addendum that properly alleges Defendant's citizenship. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this case for want of subject matter jurisdiction. Status hearing set for 5/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Walgreen Company. (ng, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
April 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) filed by Laura Hernandez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16943864. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hernandez
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: Michael C. O'Neil
Represented By: Michael Brian Galibois
Represented By: Kristen Annemarie DeGrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?