Coolballs International, LLC v. Does 1-395
Plaintiff: Coolballs International, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-395
Case Number: 1:2020cv02455
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The motion hearing set for 6/9 is stricken. The Court will endeavor to rule on the motions on the papers. Mailed notice (ca, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC Joinder Memorandum (Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Rishi Nair for presentment of motion to seal document #18 , motion for temporary restraining order #14 , motion for leave to file excess pages #13 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/9/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Telephonic Conference by Coolballs International, LLC (Nair, Rishi) Modified on 5/6/2020 (lma, ).
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC to seal document sealed document,, #17 (Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC Declaration of Hovey Zhang and Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 2/11, #2 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 3/11, #3 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 4/11, #4 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 5/11, #5 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 6/11, #6 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 7/11, #7 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 8/11, #8 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 9/11, #9 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 10/11, #10 Declaration of Hovey Zhang 11/11)(Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC Defendant Infringing Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 2/7, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 3/7, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 4/7, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 5/7, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 6/7, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 7/7)(Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Coolballs International, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #14 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kirby Dewayne Lytle, #2 Declaration of Rishi Nair, #3 Exhibit 2 of Nair Declaration)(Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC for temporary restraining order (Nair, Rishi)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Nair, Rishi)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the Third Amended General Order 20-0012, In re: Coronovirus COVID-19 Public Emergency (dated April. 24, 2020), the motion hearing set for 5/27/20 is hereby stricken. The Court will issue an order scheduling a status hearing at a future date. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (lma, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Plaintiff's motion to seal #6 is granted. The remaining relief requested in the motion #6 is entered and continued until 5/27/20 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is directed to file a memorandum discussing why joinder of all of the defendants is appropriate under Fed. R. Civ P. 20. The memorandum should not exceed 10 pages and must be filed within 14 days of this order. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Coolballs International, LLC (Nair, Rishi)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC to seal document sealed document #4 and Ex Parte TRO Motion Ex 1 (Nair, Rishi)
April 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doe Defendant List) (Nair, Rishi)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coolballs International, LLC by Rishi Nair (Nair, Rishi)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nair, Rishi)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coolballs International, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16947195. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, client webstore, #2 Exhibit 3, copyright registration certificate)(Nair, Rishi)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coolballs International, LLC v. Does 1-395
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coolballs International, LLC
Represented By: Rishi Nair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-395
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?