Gao v. Boeing Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Zhuhu Gao
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation and THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02473
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Zhuhu Gao. Rockwell Collins, Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Zhuhu Gao. Rosemount Aerospace Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Zhuhu Gao. Boeing Company, The waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 7/2/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 , #2 , #3 , #4 (sxb, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT SHORT FORM AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT filed by Zhuhu Gao; Jury Demand. (Clifford, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by John Vasilios Kalantzis (Kalantzis, John)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
April 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (sxb, ).
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Zhuhu Gao by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (sxb, ).
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (sxb, ).
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Entered in Error. (Clifford, Robert) (Incorrect pdf document linked - Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (sxb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gao v. Boeing Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhuhu Gao
Represented By: John Vasilios Kalantzis
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?