LI v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jay LI
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02496
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Jay LI in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Minetz, Robert)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: The Court adopts the parties proposed briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, which is as follows: Plaintiff is given to and including June 18, 2020 to file a response; Defendant is given to and in including July 9, 2020 to file a reply; motion is taken under advisement and will issue a ruling by mail. Status hearing set for 6/9/2020 is stricken. Notice of motion date of 5/21/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jay LI by Robert Stephen Minetz (Minetz, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jay LI by Alexander Isaac Ernst Passo (Passo, Alexander)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/21/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Claydon, Jonathan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Claydon, Jonathan)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted to and including 5/15/2020. Initial status hearing remains set for 6/9/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Status report still due by 6/4/2020. Notice of motion date of 4/30/2020 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on this date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Brian D Straw for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/30/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Straw, Brian)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time (Unopposed) (Straw, Brian)
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 6/9/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Straw, Brian)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Brian D Straw (Straw, Brian)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Jonathan Hale Claydon (Claydon, Jonathan)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020-L-3085) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16950917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Claydon, Jonathan)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LI v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Represented By: Brian D Straw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay LI
Represented By: Alexander Isaac Ernst Passo
Represented By: Robert Stephen Minetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?