International Union of Operating Engineers v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO and International Union of Operating Engineers
Defendant: F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC, an Illinois corporation and F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02499
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On plaintiff's notice #9 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International Union of Operating Engineers [Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)] (Pierson, Dale)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
April 23, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC. (ng, )
April 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by James Connolly, Jr (Connolly, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Charles R Kiser (Kiser, Charles)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pierson, Dale)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [VERIFIED] filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16951200. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Exhibit C-G)(Pierson, Dale)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Second Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D. Pierson
Represented By: James Connolly, Jr.
Represented By: Charles R Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: James Connolly, Jr.
Represented By: Charles R Kiser
Represented By: Dale D. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC, an Illinois corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?