Manning and Silverman, Ltd. v. H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Plaintiff: Manning and Silverman. Ltd.
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02609
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC for extension of time to File Motions to Compel (Durone, Anthony)
June 22, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #35 . Response due by 7/6/2020. Reply due by 7/13/2020. Reply due by 7/13/2020. Status hearing set for 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM. Status hearing set for 7/16/2020 stands. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC to dismiss Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Count II and Punitive Damage Claims (Durone, Anthony)
June 19, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to amended complaint by H&R Block Tax Services LLC(Durone, Anthony)
June 19, 2020 Filing 33 Manning & Silverman's AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES & ANSWER to counterclaim by Manning and Silverman. Ltd.(Hussain, Aon)
June 19, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manning and Silverman. Ltd. (Hussain, Aon)
June 18, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Anthony J Durone on behalf of H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Durone, Anthony)
June 17, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Motion for an Order extending deadline for parties to file motions to compel #29 is granted. Motions to Compel shall be filed by 6/26/2020. Teleconference Status hearing set for 7/16/2020 at 9:00 AM (time may change). Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to say your name each and every time before you speak. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Manning and Silverman. Ltd., Counter Defendant Manning and Silverman. Ltd. for extension of time for Parties to File Motions to Compel (Hussain, Aon)
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Manning and Silverman. Ltd. (Hussain, Aon)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Motion for extension of time to file responsive pleadings #26 is granted. Manning & Silverman shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to H&R Block's Counterclaim by 6/19/2020. H&R block shall answer or otherwise plead to Manning & Silverman's Amended Complaint by 6/19/2020. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC for extension of time to file answer (Durone, Anthony)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 24 Addendum to Agreed Discovery Schedule for Expedited Discovery by Manning and Silverman. Ltd. (Hussain, Aon)
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The Court adopts Parties' Agreed Discovery Schedule for Expedited Discovery #22 . Each Party may serve no more than 12 Requests for Production, 6 Interrogatories, and 6 Requests for Admission on or before May 18, 2020. Responses and objections to any Requests for Production, Interrogatories, and Requests for Admission served pursuant to Paragraph 2 shall be served on or before fourteen (14) days after service.In the event of any discovery dispute(s), the Parties shall meet and confer no later than June 5, 2020, in a good faith attempt to resolve those disputes. If the Parties are unable to resolve their discovery dispute(s), motions to compel discovery shall be filed with the Court no later than June 9, 2020. With regard to whether expedited depositions should be a part of the agreed proposed schedule, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer, and shall file position statements of no longer than three pages each on Thursday, May 21, 2020, by 4:00 p.m. for review by the Court. If a party requests a status conference with the Court, such party or parties shall make such request in its position statement. Status Report due by 5/21/2020.Mailed notice (lk, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 Agreed Discovery Schedule for Expedited Discovery by H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Durone, Anthony)
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED complaint by Manning and Silverman. Ltd. against H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Ruskusky, John)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/8/2020. H&R Block's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #15 is denied. The denial is without prejudice to H&R Block again moving when the societal circumstances referenced in this Order have changed. The parties are permitted to engage in expedited discovery and shall file an agreed discovery schedule on or before May 13, 2020. The parties are also permitted to file dispositive motions in spite of the General Order in place regarding COVID-19. See Order for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Manning and Silverman. Ltd.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #15 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Wayne E. Sliverman, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joel Manning)(Ruskusky, John)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall who is addressing matter as the designated emergency Judge. Telephonic Status hearing held on 5/6/2020. Oral argument heard regarding Defendant's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #15 . Plaintiff's oral motion for extension to 5:00 p.m. to respond to Motion for TRO #15 is granted. Plaintiff shall Respond to Defendant's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #15 (Dkt. 674 in 20 C 1792) by 5:00 p.m. on 5/6/2020. Motion (Dkt. 674) in emergency case shall stricken and be addressed in this case only. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall who is addressing matter as the assigned Judge. Plaintiff shall Respond to Defendant's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #15 (Dkt. 674 in 20 C 1792) by 4:00 p.m. on 5/6/2020. A telephonic status hearing is set for 5/6/2020 at 12:30 p.m. Parties have been provided the call in information by the courtroom deputy. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by H&R Block Tax Services LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Moore)(Durone, Anthony)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction (Durone, Anthony)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Anthony Durone and Benjamin Carr's Motions to appear pro hac vice #9 and #13 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16984582. , MOTION by Counter Claimant H&R Block Tax Services LLC, Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC to appoint custodian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carr, Benjamin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 H&R Block Tax Services LLC ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by H&R Block Tax Services LLC against Manning and Silverman. Ltd. . by H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Carr, Benjamin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC by Martha Jane Heiberger (Heiberger, Martha)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Manning and Silverman. Ltd. by Aon Hussain (Nixon Peabody LLP) (Hussain, Aon)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16980439. (Durone, Anthony)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Manning and Silverman. Ltd. by John T. Ruskusky (Ruskusky, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (rp, )
April 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Carr, Benjamin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC by Benjamin Paul Carr (Carr, Benjamin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carr, Benjamin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Lake County, case number (20L00000238) filed by H&R Block Tax Services LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16974490. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Carr, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning and Silverman, Ltd. v. H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Carr
Represented By: Martha Jane Heiberger
Represented By: Anthony J Durone
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manning and Silverman. Ltd.
Represented By: John T. Ruskusky
Represented By: Aon Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?