Smith et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Fair and Bryan Smith
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02612
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ford Motor Company by Mason William Kienzle (Kienzle, Mason)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ford Motor Company by Mark Howard Boyle (Boyle, Mark)
May 18, 2020 Filing 25 STATUS Report by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Boyle, Mark)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. Mailed notice. (kp, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 20 RECEIVED from California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00211 (kp)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #16 Motion to Transfer Case; Denying as Moot #17 Stipulation to Stay Case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING DATE** Hearing on #16 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case is set for Thursday, July 16, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. All other hearings and deadlines remain as set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Stay Pending Resolution Of Parties Joint Motion To Transfer Venue filed by Ford Motor Company. (Kim, Heather) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 3/27/2020. Replies due by 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, #2 Declaration of Heather S. Kim, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order)(Kim, Heather) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. Kim (Kim, Heather) (Filed on 3/13/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14132824.) filed by Daniel Fair, Bryan Smith. (Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 2/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lisa A. White ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14132791.) filed by Daniel Fair, Bryan Smith. (White, Lisa) (Filed on 2/3/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for April 29, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bryan Smith, Daniel Fair. Service waived by Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 1/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/28/2020. b (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Fair, Bryan Smith.. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 1/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)[Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Straus, Alex) (Filed on 1/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14058608.). Filed byBryan Smith, Daniel Fair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Demand Letters, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straus, Alex) (Filed on 1/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fair
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Lisa Anne White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Smith
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Lisa Anne White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Heather Kim
Represented By: Mark Howard Boyle
Represented By: Mason William Kienzle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?