Abidin et al v. The Boeing Company, a corporation
Plaintiff: Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi, Tandina Sukarno Putri and Zainal Abidin
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02643
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rc, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/4/2020.(rc, )
May 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Zainal Abidin, Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi, Tandina Sukarno Putri by Austin William Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bartlett, Austin)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zainal Abidin, Tandina Sukarno Putri, Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16979194.(Bartlett, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abidin et al v. The Boeing Company, a corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siti Anbiya Ghaasyiya Ishimichi
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tandina Sukarno Putri
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zainal Abidin
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?