Suharto et al v. Boeing Company, The
Plaintiff: Suharto and Siska Ong
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02720
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Pursuant to joint stipulation of dismissal, all the claim of plaintiff Shuarto are dismissed with prejudice.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/8/2020 at 9:30AM via telephone. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/1/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT. All claims of plaintiffs: SISKA ONG, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ROBERT SUSANTO, individually, and as next friend of her minor child H.N., in Consolidated Case No. 1: 18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-02720; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/20.(jh, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: All claims of plaintiffs: SISKA ONG, as Personal Representative of the Estate of WENDY, individually, and as next friend of her minor child H.N., in Consolidated Case No. 1: 18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-02720; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs;, Siska Ong (Administrator of the Estates of Wendy and Robert Susanto) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF SUHARTO (Hedayat, Mazyar)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED Pretrial Order APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT (Hedayat, Mazyar)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Siska Ong to dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT (Hedayat, Mazyar)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED Pretrial Order APPROVING JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT (Hedayat, Mazyar)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Siska Ong to dismiss JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT (Hedayat, Mazyar)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
May 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Siska Ong, Suharto by Mazyar Malek Hedayat (Hedayat, Mazyar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hedayat, Mazyar)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Suharto; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16989157.(Hedayat, Mazyar)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suharto et al v. Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suharto
Represented By: Mazyar Malek Hedayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siska Ong
Represented By: Mazyar Malek Hedayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?