RooR International BV et al v. ID Trading Inc et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream Inc.
Defendant: John Doe, ID Trading Inc, Tobacco House, Ishag Daoud and Kawkab Daoud
Case Number: 1:2020cv02923
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. (kp, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 18 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (kp, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 1:19-cv-01280 (kp)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 5/15/2020. Plaintiffs filed an Amended Motion to Transfer Venue #14 on April 18, 2020. Plaintiffs requested transfer of venue to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), which states: "For the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice, a district court may transfer any civil action to any other district or division where it might have been brought or to any district or division to which all parties have consented." The motion states that both Plaintiffs and Defendants consent to transfer of this action to the Northern District of Illinois. Plaintiffs state that they have been in contact with Vani Vadem, Defendants' attorney of record in this case. Attached as Exhibit A to the Amended Motion to Transfer Venue is affidavit executed by attorney Vadem indicating that his clients, Defendants ID Trading, Inc., Ishag Daoud, and Kawkab Daoud, consent to transfer this action to the Northern District of Illinois. Considering that all parties consent to transfer, and that no response or objection has been filed to the motion by the response date of May 4, 2020, the court hereby GRANTS the Amended Motion to Transfer Venue #14 , and directs the clerk to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
April 18, 2020 Filing 14 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Norther District Illinois by Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream Inc. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Veni Vedam)(Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/14/2020. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/30/2020. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response #13 and the Order to Show Cause #10 is DISCHARGED. The Court directs the parties to submit a status report within 45 days. (DS, ilcd)[Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RooR International BV, Sream Inc SUPPLEMENT RE SERVICE. (Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/18/2020. On 2/18/20, the Court directed Plaintiffs to submit summonses for Defendants listed on the Amended Complaint #12 to the Clerk for issuance. As of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs have not yet submitted summonses. The Court directs Plaintiffs to submit the summonses within 7 days or risk dismissal of those Defendants. (Miscellaneous Deadline 3/25/2020)(DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/2020. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit summons to the Clerk for issuance at newcases.urbana@ilcd.uscourts.gov. Once Plaintiff shows proof of service, the Court will discharge the Order to Show Cause. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ID Trading Inc., d/b/a Tobacco House, Ishag Daoud, Kawkab Daoud, filed by Sream Inc, RooR International BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RooR International BV, Sream Inc re #7 Order to Show Cause . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint (without exhibits))(Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/31/20. Plaintiff to show cause why case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution within 14 days. See written Order. (Show Cause Response due by 2/14/20.) (TC, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/12/2019. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Response to Rule to Show Cause #8 is the Court's Order to Show Cause #7 is hereby DISCHARGED. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sream Inc, RooR International BV. Tobacco House served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RooR International BV, Sream Inc re #7 Order to Show Cause . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service Tobacco House)(Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/25/2019. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of this entry to comply. See written Order. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2019.(DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tobacco House and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/7/2019. The court's Order #5 dismissing the case is hereby VACATED, as the filing fee was paid on September 27. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 **VACATED** JUDGMENT entered. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 10/7/2019 to show vacated (DS, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order **VACATED** TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 10/7/2019. Plaintiffs filed this civil matter in the Peoria Division on August 19, 2019. This case was then transferred to the Urbana Division on August 27, 2019. On September 16, 2019, Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long issued an order noting that Plaintiffs had yet to pay the $400 filing fee, and directing Plaintiffs to pay the fee by September 27, 2019, or face dismissal. Despite the court's warning, Plaintiffs have still not paid the required $400 filing fee. Therefore, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), the court dismisses this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Eiler v. South Dakota Human Services Center, 676 Fed.Appx. 595, 596 (7th Cir. Feb. 13, 2017). This case is terminated. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 10/7/2019 to show vacated; case reopened(KM, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24626008985. (DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/16/2019. Plaintiff filed its Complaint on 8/19/19. To date, Plaintiff has not paid the $400 filing fee. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay the filing fee on or before 9/27/19 or this case will be dismissed. (Other Deadline set for 9/27/2019.)(DS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Urbana Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/27/2019. (KZ, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc. . (Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2019. (JRK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by RooR International BV and Sream, Inc. (FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/20/19. Exhibits C [1-3] and D [1-4] attached to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 contain original signatures. The Clerk is directed to place Exhibits C and D under seal and the Plaintiffs are directed to file redacted copies of Exhibits C and D which comply with Local Rule 5.11(A).(FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 alleges that venue is proper in this district under 28 U.S.C. 1391(b) because "the Defendants reside in this district, a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred in this district, and the Defendants are subject to personal jurisdiction in this Judicial District with respect to this action, and there is no other district in which the action may otherwise be brought." Local Rule 40.1 provides the divisions of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois in which complaints and subsequent filings will be filed. See Local Rule 40.1(A)-(D). The Complaint further alleges that Defendant Tobacco House is an Illinois corporation with its principal place of business in Bradley, Illinois. Bradley, Illinois is in Kankakee County which is in the Urbana Division. The Complaint does not state, as part of the statement of jurisdiction, the basis for filing in the Peoria Division. See Local Rule 40.1(F). In light of this, the Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing, by 8/26/2019, why this case should not be transferred to the Urbana Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/20/2019. (KZ, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher V Langone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langone, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by RooR International BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USPTO- Notice of Recordation of Assignment, #2 Exhibit B. RooR Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit C. License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D. Agreement Scream Roor international, #5 Exhibit E. Product Purchase from Defendant, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) Modified on 9/27/2019 Filing fee $400 paid (KM, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 5/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RooR International BV et al v. ID Trading Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID Trading Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tobacco House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ishag Daoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawkab Daoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?