H.S. v. TikTok, Inc et al
Plaintiff: H.S.
Defendant: Beijing Bytedance Technology Co. Ltd, TikTok, Inc and Musical.ly
Case Number: 1:2020cv03007
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: This case has been reassigned to Judge Lee. The status hearing set before Judge Lefkow on 7/28/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/2020. (lma, )
May 22, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Beijing Bytedance Technology Co. Ltd, ByteDance, Inc., Musical.ly, TikTok, Inc. (ng, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.S. by Megan Shannon (Shannon, Megan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.S. by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.S. by Andrew C. Ficzko (Ficzko, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.S. by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 7/28/2020 at 11:00 a.m. The dates set in this case shall not be impacted by general orders related to COVID-19 absent good cause shown. Mailed notice (ags)
May 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by H. S.; YES. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17031919.(Zouras, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.S. v. TikTok, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing Bytedance Technology Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Musical.ly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.S.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?