Laggos v. Rexnord Aerospace
Plaintiff: Ronald Laggos
Defendant: Rexnord Aerospace
Case Number: 1:2020cv03038
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 7/21/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17037423. (Zolfo, Michael)
May 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rexnord Aerospace(Zolfo, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Rexnord Aerospace (Zolfo, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rexnord Aerospace by Patrick S Nolan (Nolan, Patrick)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rexnord Aerospace by Michael Gerald Zolfo (Zolfo, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zolfo, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 18th Judicial Circuit, DuPage County, IL, case number (2020 L 000276) filed by Rexnord Aerospace (Zolfo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laggos v. Rexnord Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Laggos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Aerospace
Represented By: Michael Gerald Zolfo
Represented By: Patrick S Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?