Desmangles v. Saul
Plaintiff: Laureen Desmangles
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03039
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Agreed motion for attorney fees #18 is granted. See attached order. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/25/2021: Mailed notice (maf)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for attorney fees (Agreed) (Lindland, Kurt)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/15/2021:Mailed notice(maf)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order, For the reasons stated herein, the Court denies the Commissioner's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 19), vacates the findings of the Administrative Law Judge and remands to the Social Security Administration for proceedings consistent with this opinion. The Clerk is directed to remand this case, forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/15/2021: Mailed notice (daj, )
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY by Laureen Desmangles to memorandum in support of motion #14 (Danish, Jennifer)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Andrew Saul in support of motion for summary judgment #13 (Lindland, Kurt)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for summary judgment (Lindland, Kurt)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time #11 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file response/reply as to memorandum #9 (Lindland, Kurt)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Per LR 16.4, the Social Security Administration must file its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support on or before 1/21/21. Plaintiff Desmangles must file a reply brief, if any, on or before 2/4/21. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Laureen Desmangles --Plaintiff's Brief (Danish, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Defendant Andrew Saul (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lindland, Kurt)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lindland, Kurt)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Danish, Jennifer)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Kurt N. Lindland as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Saul (Lindland, Kurt)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Laureen Desmangles; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17035227. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Danish, Jennifer)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desmangles v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laureen Desmangles
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Danish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Kurt N. Lindland
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Kurt N. Lindland
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?