MTDB Corp. v. American Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MTDB Corp. and MTDB Corp. doing business as Striker Lanes
Defendant: American Automobile Insurance Company and American Automobile Insurance Company doing business as Fireman's Fund/Allianz
Case Number: 1:2020cv03127
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #18 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (dal, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Neiman, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MTDB Corp. by Antonio Maurizio Romanucci (Romanucci, Antonio)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MTDB Corp. by Sarah Erica King (King, Sarah)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #10 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 7/23/2020. Mailed notice. (dal, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company by Bruce Daniel Celebrezze (Celebrezze, Bruce)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company by Catalina Jean Sugayan (Sugayan, Catalina)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Automobile Insurance Company (Garthwaite, Peter)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer Unopposed (Garthwaite, Peter)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company by Peter John Garthwaite for Catalina J. Sugayan (Garthwaite, Peter)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company by Peter John Garthwaite for Bruce D. Celebrezze (Garthwaite, Peter)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company by Peter John Garthwaite (Garthwaite, Peter)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
May 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Automobile Insurance Company. (ng, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 7/28/2020 at 9:15 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. The Court expects to hold the status hearing telephonically. Parties will be contacted closer to the hearing date with a call-in number and additional details. Mailed notice. Mailed notice. (dal, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MTDB Corp. d/b/a Striker Lanes by David Adam Neiman for Antonio M Romanucci (Neiman, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MTDB Corp. d/b/a Striker Lanes by David Adam Neiman (Neiman, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MTDB Corp. d/b/a Striker Lanes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17057055. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attorney Appearance for David A Neiman, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Neiman, David)
May 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTDB Corp. v. American Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTDB Corp.
Represented By: David Adam Neiman
Represented By: Sarah Erica King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTDB Corp. doing business as Striker Lanes
Represented By: David Adam Neiman
Represented By: Sarah Erica King
Represented By: Antonio Maurizio Romanucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter John Garthwaite
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Celebrezze
Represented By: Catalina Jean Sugayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Insurance Company doing business as Fireman's Fund/Allianz
Represented By: Peter John Garthwaite
Represented By: Bruce Daniel Celebrezze
Represented By: Catalina Jean Sugayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?