Jackson v. Manpower US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aaron L. Jackson
Defendant: ManpowerGroup, Inc. and Manpower US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03143
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Orly Michal Henry of Change of Address (Suite Number) (Henry, Orly)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss #16 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 8/12/2020. Defendant to reply by 9/2/2020. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/7/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The scheduling conference date of 8/6/2020 and the Rule 26(f) planning report are stricken, pending disposition of motion. No appearance required on 7/16/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Orly Michal Henry for presentment of motion to compel #16 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Henry, Orly)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. in support of motion to compel #16 /Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Compel Arbitration & Dismiss (Henry, Orly)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. to compel /Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Henry, Orly)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron L. Jackson by Brendan James Duffner (Duffner, Brendan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron L. Jackson by Andrew T Heldut (Heldut, Andrew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aaron L. Jackson by Timothy Patrick Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Timothy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted; answer due 7/6/2020. If a motion in lieu of answer is filed it shall be noticed up on this court's motion call and the court will set briefing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance required). A joint Rule 26 planning report due 8/3/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. The MIDP program has ended and the Notice to the Parties re MIDP dated 5/28/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (reg)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Orly Michal Henry for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Henry, Orly)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. for extension of time to file answer /Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Henry, Orly)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rc, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Manpower US Inc. (Henry, Orly)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ManpowerGroup, Inc. (Henry, Orly)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. by Patricia J. Martin (Martin, Patricia)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. by Kwabena Agyepong Appenteng (Appenteng, Kwabena)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. by Orly Michal Henry (Henry, Orly)
May 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henry, Orly)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020CH03703) filed by Manpower US Inc., ManpowerGroup, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17060553. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Heather Gatewood, #3 Exhibit 3: Notice to Adverse Parties, #4 Exhibit 4: Notice to State Court of Filing Removal)(Henry, Orly)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Manpower US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManpowerGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Orly Michal Henry
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Kwabena Agyepong Appenteng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manpower US Inc.
Represented By: Orly Michal Henry
Represented By: Patricia J. Martin
Represented By: Kwabena Agyepong Appenteng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron L. Jackson
Represented By: Andrew T Heldut
Represented By: Brendan James Duffner
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Kingsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?