Lucas v. Saul
Plaintiff: Joshua Lucas
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03213
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Motion for Extension of Time to File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record #17 is granted. Defendant is to file its answer and administrative record by 10/2/20 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 10/30/20. Defendant's response brief is due 11/30/20. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 12/14/20. Mailed notice (np, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Andrew M. Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Terman, Sarah)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This matter has been reassigned to Judge Cox. Briefing schedule set by the District Judge on 6/3/2020, #10 to stand. Defendant is to file its answer and administrative record by 8/3/20 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 8/31/20. Defendant's response brief is due 9/29/20. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 10/13/20. Mailed notice (np, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Susan E. Cox, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/17/2020. (sxb, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The parties filed a joint consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case will be reassigned.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Terman, Sarah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 granted. Pursuant to Local Rule 4(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(a)(2), the defendant is to file its answer and administrative record by 8/3/20. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 8/31/20. Defendant's response brief is due 9/29/20. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 10/13/20. Ruling by mail. Counsel should note that these dates modify the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Counsel are further directed to meet and confer prior to the date the answer and administrative record are filed to determine whether: (a) the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and (b) an agreed remand order is necessary. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the appropriate form to execute and file with the court may be found at the following location: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/PUBLIC/Forms/consent.pdf.Mailed notice (ca, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Lucas by Justin Roger Poh (corrected) (Poh, Justin)
June 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Joshua Lucas against Andrew M. Saul (Spector, Deborah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Lucas by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Lucas by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Lucas by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Joshua Lucas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Spector, Deborah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Lucas; (Spector, Deborah)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lucas
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Sarah Fattahi Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?