Prinzo & Associates, LLC v. BMO Harris Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Prinzo & Associates, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-100, BMO Harris Bank, N.A. and BMO Financial Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03256
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The court will decide whether to set a case schedule once it has an opportunity to see Defendants' forthcoming motion to dismiss, which the status report indicates will be filed on or before 8/14/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the 6/30/2020 order #18 , the initial status hearing set for 8/3/2020 #8 is stricken and re-set for 8/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 8/21/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the initial status hearing and initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 8/28/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Prinzo & Associates, LLC (McCune, Richard)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 8/3/2020 status hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. by Julie Rodriguez Aldort (Aldort, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #14 is granted. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading is extended to 8/14/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion to proceed pro hac vice #13 is granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. re MOTION by Defendants BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding summons returned executed #9 , summons returned executed #10 , complaint #1 #14 (Jamison, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding summons returned executed #9 , summons returned executed #10 , complaint #1 (Jamison, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17121147. (Vercoski, Michele)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17121114. (McCune, Richard)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison (Jamison, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC as to BMO Financial Corp. on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Brandt, Derek)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC as to BMO Harris Bank, N.A. on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Brandt, Derek)
June 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BMO Financial Corp., BMO Harris Bank, N.A. (ng, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/3/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 7/27/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the initial status hearing and initial Status Report.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding #6 . (pj, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Entered in Error (pj, ) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/3/2020)(pj, ).
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prinzo & Associates, LLC by Leigh Michele Perica (Perica, Leigh)
June 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prinzo & Associates, LLC by Derek Yeats Brandt (Brandt, Derek)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brandt, Derek)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Prinzo & Associates, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17074486.(Brandt, Derek)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prinzo & Associates, LLC v. BMO Harris Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edmund Jamison
Represented By: Julie Rodriguez Aldort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Financial Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edmund Jamison
Represented By: Julie Rodriguez Aldort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prinzo & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Leigh Michele Perica
Represented By: Michele Vercoski
Represented By: Richard D McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?