Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods v. Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Chicago O'Hare Suites et al
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods
Defendant: Benjamen Von Bruenchenhein and Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Chicago O'Hare Suites
Case Number: 1:2020cv03312
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 6/12/2020: This order is entered in Judge Pacold's capacity as emergency judge: Plaintiff's motion for Temporary Restraining Order #6 is granted.(rao, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephonic motion hearing held on 6/10/2020 regarding Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #6 . (rao, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods as to Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Chicago O'Hare Suites on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Serritella, William)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. (rao, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:This order is entered in Judge Pacold's capacity as emergency judge. Telephonic initial status hearing held on 6/8/2020. Telephonic hearing on motion for temporary restraining order #6 set for 6/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel should dial the conference call-in number: (888) 684-8852, followed by the access code 9482028#. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to promptly serve this order on defendants by email and Federal Express. (rao, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Telephone Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 10:30 a.m. (rao, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: This court will hold an initial telephonic status hearing on 6/8/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel should dial the conference call-in number: (888) 684-8852, followed by the access code 9482028#. (rao, )
June 5, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Benjamen Von Bruenchenhein, Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC. (ng, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Serritella, William)
June 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by Nicollette Liv Khuans (Khuans, Nicollette)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by William J. Serritella, Jr (Serritella, William)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Serritella, William)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17082225. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Serritella, William)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods v. Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Chicago O'Hare Suites et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamen Von Bruenchenhein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago ORD Hotel Partners, LLC d/b/a Renaissance Chicago O'Hare Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?