Summers v. RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Summers
Defendant: Curtis M. Selquist, Robert P. Jordheim, Thomas A. McEachin, Paul G. Thomas, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Christopher R. Sweeney, Shirley A. Weis, Brian K. Hutchison, Nicholas J. Valeriani, Peter F. Gearen, Camille I. Farhat, Johannes W. Louw, Jonathon M. Singer and Mark D. Stolper
Case Number: 1:2020cv03347
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominick DeFilippis by Marvin Alan Miller (Miller, Marvin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM motion for miscellaneous relief, #37 by Dominick DeFilippis Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel, and Opposition to the Motion of Plaintiffs Campbell and Summers for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Miller, Marvin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION by Unknown Dominick DeFilippisMotion to Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel, and Opposition to the Motion of Plaintiffs Campbell and Summers for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Marvin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 36 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Camille I. Farhat, Peter F. Gearen, Thomas A. McEachin, Curtis M. Selquist, Jonathon M. Singer, Mark D. Stolper, Christopher R. Sweeney, Paul G. Thomas, Nicholas J. Valeriani, Shirley A. Weis (Durkin, Martin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 7/10/2020. Defendants' motion to consolidate cases #6 is granted as to the request to consolidate. Cases 20 C 3347, 20 C 3464, and 20 C 3953 are hereby consolidated, and all filings should be made under Case 20 C 3347 only, but using all three captions until further order. Any response to the motion to appoint a leadership structure is due by 7/31/2020. Parties are to file a joint status report by 7/31/2020 that states how the parties wish to proceed in regards to the complaint (filing a consolidated complaint, or some other alternative). Telephonic status hearing is set for 10/8/2020 at 8:45 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Mailed notice. (mma, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Peter F. Gearen, Thomas A. McEachin, Curtis M. Selquist, Mark D. Stolper, Christopher R. Sweeney, Paul G. Thomas, Nicholas J. Valeriani, Shirley A. Weis by Martin G. Durkin (Durkin, Martin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. by James Wallace Ducayet (Ducayet, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Adam Schwartz and Russell Koonin to appear pro hac vice are granted. Defendant's motion to substitute counsel is also granted. (mk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Martin G. Durkin for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #29 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/14/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Durkin, Martin)
July 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants Camille I. Farhat, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer to substitute attorney Defendant RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc.'s Motion for Substitution of Counsel (Durkin, Martin)
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johannes W. Louw by Vivek Jayaram Amended Appearance (Jayaram, Vivek)
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johannes W. Louw by Elizabeth Ann Austermuehle Attorney Appearance Form (Austermuehle, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johannes W. Louw by Vivek Jayaram Attorney Appearance Form (Jayaram, Vivek)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Designation of Local Counsel by Johannes W. Louw (Koonin, Russell)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17175439. (Koonin, Russell)
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17175372. (Schwartz, Adam)
July 3, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions to appear pro hac vice #17 #18 #19 #21 are granted. (mk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17169548. on behalf of Plaintiff David Summers (Kim, Phillip)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by James K. Goldfarb (Goldfarb, James)
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17168754. (Warren, Stephen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17168710. (McAlpin, Louise)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17168669. (Kernisky, Allison)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by Stephen J Crimmins /AMENDED (Crimmins, Stephen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by Stephen J Crimmins (Crimmins, Stephen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by Alan M Wolper (Wolper, Alan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Camille I. Farhat, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer (Durkin, Martin)
June 27, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Keara Gordon and Deborah Meshluam to appear pro hac vice #10 #11 are granted. (mk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17151987. on behalf of Robert P. Jordheim (Meshulam, Deborah)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17151971. on behalf of Robert P. Jordheim - (Gordon, Keara)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Robert P. Jordheim by Yan Grinblat (Grinblat, Yan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the motion hearing noticed by counsel for 6/30/2020 is vacated and reset to 7/10/2020 at 10:20 AM, the date and time of the status hearing in this and the related cases. (mk)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Martin G. Durkin for presentment of motion to consolidate cases, #6 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/30/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Durkin, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Camille I. Farhat, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer to consolidate cases All Parties' Joint Motion to Consolidate, to Excuse Response to Initial Complaint and to Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Durkin, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camille I. Farhat, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer by Martin G. Durkin (Durkin, Martin)
June 20, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case, together with Case Nos. 20 C 1939 and 20 C 3464, are set for a telephonic status hearing on 7/10/2020 at 10:20 AM, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 of this Court. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/2020. (nsf, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Summers as to RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Malmstrom, Carl)
June 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Camille I. Farhat, Peter F. Gearen, Brian K. Hutchison, Robert P. Jordheim, Johannes W. Louw, Thomas A. McEachin, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Curtis M. Selquist, Jonathon M. Singer, Mark D. Stolper, Christopher R. Sweeney, Paul G. Thomas, Nicholas J. Valeriani, Shirley A. Weis (ng, )
June 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint) filed by David Summers; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17086464. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Shareholder Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summers v. RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis M. Selquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Jordheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. McEachin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley A. Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Valeriani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Gearen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille I. Farhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johannes W. Louw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon M. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Stolper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Summers
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?