Shah v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03355
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Jonice Gray Tucker (Tucker, Jonice)
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #13 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a response pleading is extended to 8/20/2020. The status hearing set for 8/14/2020 #7 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 9/11/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17213126. (Tucker, Jonice)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding received complaint #1 (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time from 07/23/20 to 08/20/20 for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint) (Hletko, Valerie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Scott Tadashi Sakiyama (Sakiyama, Scott)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Valerie Lynn Hletko (Hletko, Valerie)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (ph, )
June 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued, Certified copy of Order dated 6/9/20 as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to U.S. Marshal for service via email. (gcy, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed by Vivek Shah. (Exhibits).(gcy, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted.The Clerk is directed to issue summons for service on Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. The Marshals Service is directed to serve summons using the USM-285 form 5 that Plaintiff has filed. Status hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Vivek Shah (lma, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Vivek Shah to proceed without prepaying fees or costs/financial affidavit. (lma, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Vivek Shah. (Exhibits) (lma, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonice Gray Tucker
Represented By: Valerie Lynn Hletko
Represented By: Scott Tadashi Sakiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?