Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC v. Gupta
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Defendant: Rajesh Gupta
Case Number: 1:2020cv03386
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 38 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Sage Prince Holdings, LLC (Third Party), Rajesh Gupta. (No Notice Filed) (rc, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 37 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Golan Christie Taglia LLP, Maduff & Maduff LLC. (All Third Party) (All No Notice Filed) (rc, )
May 28, 2021 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC by Martin S. Kedziora (Kedziora, Martin)
February 11, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER OF THIRD PARTY RESPONDENT CITATION by E*TRADE Securities LLC as to Rajesh N. Gupta(mc, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 33 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to E*TRADE Securities LLC (Third Party) (No Notice). (mc, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Defendant Rajesh Gupta to citation issued #23 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lederer, Caren)
January 28, 2021 Filing 29 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/28/2021. (mk)
January 22, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Agreed motion for protective order #27 is granted. However, counsel did not send a Word version of the order to Judge Kennelly's proposed order e-mail address concurrently with the filing of the motion, as directed on Judge Kennelly's web page. They are to do so promptly. (mk)
January 21, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Rajesh Gupta for protective order (Agreed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lederer, Caren)
January 9, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for extension of time to 1/20/2021 to respond to plaintiff's citation to discover assets is granted. (mk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Rajesh Gupta for extension of time to Respond to Citation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Lederer, Caren)
December 22, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rajesh Gupta by Caren A. Lederer (Lederer, Caren)
December 8, 2020 Filing 23 CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Rajesh Gupta. (rc, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 22 ENTERED JUDGMENT: Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mma, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court directs entry of judgment confirming the arbitration award in favor of plaintiff Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC in the amount of $1,965,075.83, consisting of the arbitration award of $1,829,115.18, post-award interest of $42,960.65, and attorney's fees of $93,000.00. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic hearing on motion held on 10/9/2020. Defendant's motion to stay #13 is denied for the reasons stated on the record. Petition to confirm arbitration and convert to judgment is granted. Judgment is to be entered in favor of the plaintiff confirming the arbitration award. The parties are directed to submit a Final Judgment Order to Judge Kennelly's proposed order email address by 10/13/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY by Rajesh Gupta to response in opposition to motion #18 to Stay Proceedings (Maduff, Aaron)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Rajesh Gupta to stay Opposed Motion to Stay Confirmation Proceedings Pending Settlement and Resolution of USERRA Arbitration #13 (Claydon, Jonathan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 9/17/2020. Plaintiff's response to the defendant's motion to stay #13 , is to be filed by 9/25/2020; defendant's reply is due 10/2/2020. A telephonic status and ruling on the motion hearings are set for 10/9/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearings: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Daniel Gajda on behalf of Rajesh Gupta regarding attorney appearance #15 (Gajda, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rajesh Gupta by Daniel Gajda (Gajda, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets this case for a telephone status hearing on 9/17/2020 at 8:40 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. (mk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Rajesh Gupta to stay Opposed Motion to Stay Confirmation Proceedings Pending Settlement and Resolution of USERRA Arbitration (Maduff, Aaron)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Rajesh Gupta(Maduff, Aaron)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The telephone status hearing set for 9/1/2020 is vacated. Defendant is directed to file a written response to the petition to confirm arbitration award by 9/15/2020; plaintiff is directed to file a reply to the response by 9/25/2020. (mk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS Report (Joint) by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rajesh Gupta by Aaron Benjamin Maduff (Maduff, Aaron)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. (Claydon, Jonathan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 8/24/2020, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 (a "status hearing," in local parlance) on 9/1/2020 at 9:25 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC by Lucia Lynn Marker-Moore (Marker-Moore, Lucia)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC by Jonathan Hale Claydon (Claydon, Jonathan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Claydon, Jonathan)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC Petition to Confirm Arbitration and Convert to Judgment Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-17092752. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Claydon, Jonathan)
June 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC v. Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajesh Gupta
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Maduff
Represented By: Daniel Gajda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Represented By: Lucia Lynn Marker-Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?