Vecere v. Boeing Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Donna Margaret Vecere
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc., Boeing Company, The and Rosemont Aerospace Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv03390
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the reassignment of this case to Judge Alonso, the initial status hearing set before Judge Dow on 7/20/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash and the Hon. M. David Weisman as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Weisman shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/17/2020. (rp, )
June 12, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The Boeing Company,, Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rosemont Aerospace Inc. (ng, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Donna Margaret Vecere by Brian LaCien (LaCien, Brian)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Donna Margaret Vecere by Todd A. Smith (Smith, Todd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Todd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Donna Margaret Vecere; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17093701.(Smith, Todd)
June 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020. Mailed notice(las, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vecere v. Boeing Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Collins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemont Aerospace Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Margaret Vecere
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: Brian LaCien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?