Michalek et al v. Village of Sugar Grove
Plaintiff: Josh Polowy and Connor Michalek
Defendant: Village of Sugar Grove
Case Number: 1:2020cv03434
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 8/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the 8/17/2020 hearing is as follows: Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Connor Michalek, Josh Polowy by Timothy J. Edmier (Edmier, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Connor Michalek, Josh Polowy by Mitchell Benjamin Goldberg (Goldberg, Mitchell)
June 12, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Connor Michalek, Josh Polowy by Jonathan D. Lubin (Lubin, Jonathan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lubin, Jonathan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 AMENDED complaint by Connor Michalek, Josh Polowy against Village of Sugar Grove , COMPLAINT filed by Connor Michalek, Josh Polowy; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17101921.(Lubin, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michalek et al v. Village of Sugar Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Polowy
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lubin
Represented By: Timothy J. Edmier
Represented By: Mitchell Benjamin Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Michalek
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lubin
Represented By: Timothy J. Edmier
Represented By: Mitchell Benjamin Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Sugar Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?