Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association
Defendant: Lupin Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Lupin Ltd., Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC and Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03543
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Pursuant to the plaintiff's amended notice of voluntary dismissal #8 , this case is dismissed without prejudice to any rights that plaintiff may have individually or to its rights as a member of the proposed putative class. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Kurowski, Daniel)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff's notice #6 , titled "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)," states that plaintiff "voluntarily dismisses itself from the above-captioned litigation." It is not completely clear whether plaintiff means to dismiss this case in its entirety, as Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) provides, or to dismiss itself as a party plaintiff and leave this putative class action pending. Absent communication to the contrary from plaintiff on or before July 16, 2020, this court will assume that plaintiff intends to dismiss this action in its entirety, and this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further court order effective July 17, 2020. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Kurowski, Daniel)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before September 2, 2020. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with Fourth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/1/2020. Mailed notice(mjc, )
June 25, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (daj, )
June 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories, Inc. (ng, )
June 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association by Whitney Kendall Siehl (Siehl, Whitney)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association by Daniel J. Kurowski (Kurowski, Daniel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17118447. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kurowski, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurohealth (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross And Blue Shield Association
Represented By: Whitney Kendall Siehl
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?