Kim et al v. H Guys, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Kim, George Kim, Michael Kim and George B. Kim
Defendant: Steve H Chong, Megan M. Chong, H Guys, LLC Chicago, Vincent T. Tan and H Guys, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03588
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, in light of when waivers of service were sent, the status hearing of 08/11/2020 is reset to 09/11/2020 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Plaintiffs shall file a status report on service by 09/02/2020. Separately, on review of the complaint, the Court issues the following subject matter jurisdiction inquiry. The Plaintiffs invoke diversity jurisdiction. But the citizenship of the two LLCs is insufficiently alleged. An LLC's citizenship is not like a corporation's; instead an LLC is a citizen of every state where its members are citizens. Wise v. Wachovia Securities, LLC, 450 F.3d 265, 267 (7th Cir. 2006). Paragraphs 11 and 12 of the Complaint do not set forth the identities of the LLCs' members (let alone each member's citizenship). By 08/24/2020, the Plaintiffs shall file a Jurisdictional Statement that identifies the members and their citizenships. Also, eventually the individual defendants, after they are served, must confirm their States of citizenship; right now, the Complaint only alleges citizenship on information and belief. Lastly, to avoid confusion, the Clerk's Office shall edit the title of R. 9 to start COMPLAINT (PUBLIC VERSION). Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Douglas Kim, George B. Kim, Michael Kim (Terna, Lucas)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 28, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 08/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. If held, the initial status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 08/03/2020. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Attachment #1 Status Report Requirements)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT (PUBLIC VERSION) by George B. Kim, Douglas Kim, Michael Kim against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Terna, Lucas) Modified on 08/10/2020 (mw, ).
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' motion #6 to file redacted version of the complaint's exhibits is granted. Because it is not possible to seal CM/ECF exhibits to a primary entry, this will be accomplished as follows: the Clerk's Office shall seal R. 1 in its entirety. Plaintiffs shall file, by 07/02/2020, the redacted version of the Complaint and all of its exhibits (redacted as needed). Mailed notice (ma,)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Lucas Broderick Terna for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/29/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Terna, Lucas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Douglas Kim, George B. Kim, Michael KimRedact Confidential Information (Terna, Lucas)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Douglas Kim, George Kim, Michael Kim by Ana Raquel Bugan (Bugan, Ana)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Douglas Kim, George Kim, Michael Kim by Lucas Broderick Terna (Terna, Lucas)
June 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Douglas Kim, George Kim, Michael Kim by John Joseph Scharkey (Scharkey, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Scharkey, John)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by George Kim, Douglas Kim, Michael Kim; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17124724. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Scharkey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. H Guys, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kim
Represented By: John Joseph Scharkey
Represented By: Ana Raquel Bugan
Represented By: Lucas Broderick Terna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kim
Represented By: John Joseph Scharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kim
Represented By: John Joseph Scharkey
Represented By: Ana Raquel Bugan
Represented By: Lucas Broderick Terna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George B. Kim
Represented By: John Joseph Scharkey
Represented By: Ana Raquel Bugan
Represented By: Lucas Broderick Terna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve H Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan M. Chong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Guys, LLC Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent T. Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Guys, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?