PeopleFlo Manufacturing, Inc. v. Sundyne, LLC et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv03642
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 5/9/2022. Mailed notice (ec)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/8/2022. Mailed notice (ec)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/23/2021: DXP and PumpWorks's motion to dismiss Count IX, 79 , is granted. The dismissal is without prejudice. Sundyne's and Accudyne's motions to dismiss Counts IV and V, 82 and 94 , are denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PeopleFlo Manufacturing, Inc. v. Sundyne, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?