Wheeler et al v. Selene Finance LP
Plaintiff: Kevin Wheeler and Julieanne Wheeler
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv03694
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Joseph S. Davidson's motion to withdraw #9 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Attorney Joseph S. Davidson to withdraw as attorney for Julieanne Wheeler, Kevin Wheeler. No party information provided (Davidson, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS Report (Initial) by Julieanne Wheeler, Kevin Wheeler (Davidson, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kevin Wheeler, Julieanne Wheeler. Selene Finance LP waiver sent on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Davidson, Joseph)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/27/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)8186699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Selene Finance LP. (acm, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Julieanne Wheeler, Kevin Wheeler by Victor Thomas Metroff (Metroff, Victor)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Julieanne Wheeler, Kevin Wheeler by Mohammed Omar Badwan (Badwan, Mohammed)
June 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Julieanne Wheeler, Kevin Wheeler by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kevin Wheeler, Julieanne Wheeler; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17139616. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler et al v. Selene Finance LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wheeler
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieanne Wheeler
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?