INTL FCStone Financial Inc. v. Yoon
Plaintiff: INTL FCStone Financial Inc.
Defendant: Paul K Yoon
Case Number: 1:2020cv03764
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Paul K Yoon for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Schumacher, Daryl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. No appearance is required on Friday, July 24, 2020. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paul K Yoon by Daryl M. Schumacher (Schumacher, Daryl)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by James L. Kopecky for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/24/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kopecky, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Paul K Yoon for extension of time to file answer (Kopecky, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paul K Yoon by James L. Kopecky (Kopecky, James)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTL FCStone Financial Inc. as to Paul K Yoon on 6/27/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Lasky, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Paul K Yoon. (acm, )
June 26, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by INTL FCStone Financial Inc. (Lasky, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff INTL FCStone Financial Inc. by Seth Eli Darmstadter (Darmstadter, Seth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff INTL FCStone Financial Inc. by Matthew Ross Lasky (Lasky, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lasky, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by INTL FCStone Financial Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17150061. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Darmstadter, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTL FCStone Financial Inc. v. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTL FCStone Financial Inc.
Represented By: Seth Eli Darmstadter
Represented By: Matthew Ross Lasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul K Yoon
Represented By: Daryl M. Schumacher
Represented By: James L. Kopecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?