minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone et al v. TikTok Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S.P., J.P., K.P., G.P., minors, by and through their guardian, Katie Patterman and N.T. and L.T., minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone
Defendant: ByteDance, Inc. and TikTok Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv03771
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: This case has been consolidated with E.R. v. TikTok, 20C2810. Accordingly, this case is terminated. All future filings shall be made in 20C2810. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 8/6/2020 #4 is stricken. This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge John Z. Lee #5 . The parties shall contact Judge John Z. Lee for further proceedings.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Honorable Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 7/7/2020.(rp, ) Modified on 7/7/2020 (rp, ).
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial telephonic status hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial status report by 7/30/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 26, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ByteDance, Inc., and TikTok Inc. (acm, )
June 26, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs S.P., J.P., K.P., G.P., minors, by and through their guardian, Katie Patterman, N.T. and L.T., minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone by Elizabeth A. Fegan (Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fegan, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by S.P., J.P., K.P., G.P., minors, by and through their guardian, Katie Patterman, N.T. and L.T., minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17150679.(Fegan, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone et al v. TikTok Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.P., J.P., K.P., G.P., minors, by and through their guardian, Katie Patterman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.T. and L.T., minors, by and through their guardian, Darcy Tellone
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?