H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: H-D U.S.A., LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Jinleda store, Little Jewel Store, kiuy10, Kevin Hill, Zhangxihua, Painting Zhuistar Store, XINSHENMEI Store, Natemastsiste, Candice Eldredge99, loveSanqing, Maxsin Fun Store, li shi qu san xian sheng xian bian li dian, Shop5149033 Store, homecollection Store, Sweet Dream US, Sail Sailing, JEWURA, Greston Miller, ospomkreg, LAMUCH USA, LOLIPE Store, Shop5838060 Store, LYCYGG, Q&Q Store, SLDFJJRMFGG, YALIUYA, Flyingcathy, DNA DESIGN Store, ODDITY DERIVATIVES Official Store, motorcycle car Store, sdgbvdzsc558r58drf, SZFR Store, Zuowei accessories shop Store, SEVENTIN Official Store, kaze wind, CJYShop, Shop5586047 Store, REWPYT, Winter56, huatuojinchukoumaoyi1, HATNGOC, jiayao Store, GHPM HG, XIAOLAOBIAO, UNRY, Supre Adult Store, Shop5840182 Store, Shop5441256 Store, wenwensmt Store, Shop5730328 Store, CHAMER, fengtian sky, Gredstar, Holland and Kate, Day With Night Party Store, AutoJZWT Gold-Moto Store, Sundry House Store, YUEWANG Store, Home bathroom products, Virginia Howard, SURLA, TotG Store, Wellgain Car Accessories Store, Esonbuy-US, Aansot.N8, IELGY, Golden Gate Bridge-COM, XIAOF-FEN, LCCKSS, treachihome Store, Shop5797628 Store, The Family's Patch and hina liff Store
Case Number: 1:2020cv03838
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
August 7, 2020 NEW PARTIES: hina liff Store, LOLIPE Store, Maxsin Fun Store, Painting Zhuistar Store, SEVENTIN Official Store, SZFR Store, AutoJZWT Gold-Moto Store, Day With Night Party Store, DNA DESIGN Store, homecollection Store, jiayao Store, Little Jewel Store, motorcycle car Store, ODDITY DERIVATIVES Official Store, Q&Q Store, Shop5149033 Store, Shop5441256 Store, Shop5586047 Store, Shop5730328 Store, Shop5797628 Store, Shop5838060 Store, Shop5840182 Store, Sundry House Store, Supre Adult Store, TotG Store, treachihome Store, Wellgain Car Accessories Store, wenwensmt Store, XINSHENMEI Store, YUEWANG Store, Zuowei accessories shop Store, Aansot.N8, CHAMER, CJYShop, Esonbuy-US, fengtian sky, Flyingcathy, GHPM HG, Golden Gate Bridge-COM, Gredstar, HATNGOC, Holland and Kate, Home bathroom products, huatuojinchukoumaoyi1, IELGY, JEWURA, Jinleda store, kaze wind, LAMUCH USA, LCCKSS, li shi qu san xian sheng xian bian li dian, loveSanqing, LYCYGG, REWPYT, Sail Sailing, sdgbvdzsc558r58drf, SLDFJJRMFGG, SURLA, Sweet Dream US, The Family's Patch, UNRY, Winter56, XIAOF-FEN, XIAOLAOBIAO, YALIUYA, Zhangxihua, Candice Eldredge99, Greston Miller, Kevin Hill, kiuy10, Natemastsiste, ospomkreg and Virginia Howard added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy)
August 4, 2020 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/4/2020. Mailed notice(gel, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Emergency motion hearing held on 8/4/2020 via telephone by Emergency District Judge John Robert Blakey. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Oral motion to unseal all documents is also granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral motion to construe Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #30 as an emergency motion is granted. Motion hearing set for 8/4/2020 is converted to a telephonic motion hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #30 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/4/2020 at 11:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by H-D U.S.A., LLC as to certain defendant (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
August 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (daj, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for extension of temporary restraining order #24 . The Court finds good cause to extend the temporary restraining order through 8/6/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/23/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of extension of time #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order: Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/9/2020. Mailed notice. (bg, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #8 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #10 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #15 is granted. [Enter signed Sealed Temporary Restraining Order]. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by H-D U.S.A., LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by H-D U.S.A., LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by H-D U.S.A., LLC re MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) #15 , MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery #10 , MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file Under Seal #8 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-4 regarding declaration #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3, #4 Exhibit 3-4)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Adraea M. Brown regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by H-D U.S.A., LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (rc, )
June 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC for leave to file Under Seal (Gaudio, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff H-D U.S.A., LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by H-D U.S.A., LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17159427. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H-D U.S.A., LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-D U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Martin Francis Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jinleda store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Jewel Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kiuy10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhangxihua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Painting Zhuistar Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XINSHENMEI Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natemastsiste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Eldredge99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: loveSanqing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxsin Fun Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: li shi qu san xian sheng xian bian li dian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5149033 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: homecollection Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Dream US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sail Sailing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEWURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greston Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ospomkreg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMUCH USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOLIPE Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5838060 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYCYGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q&Q Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLDFJJRMFGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YALIUYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flyingcathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNA DESIGN Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODDITY DERIVATIVES Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: motorcycle car Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sdgbvdzsc558r58drf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SZFR Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuowei accessories shop Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVENTIN Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kaze wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJYShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5586047 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REWPYT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter56
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huatuojinchukoumaoyi1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HATNGOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jiayao Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHPM HG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XIAOLAOBIAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supre Adult Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5840182 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5441256 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wenwensmt Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5730328 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fengtian sky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gredstar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland and Kate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day With Night Party Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoJZWT Gold-Moto Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundry House Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUEWANG Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home bathroom products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TotG Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellgain Car Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esonbuy-US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aansot.N8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IELGY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Bridge-COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XIAOF-FEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LCCKSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: treachihome Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop5797628 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Family's Patch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hina liff Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?