Klein Tools, Inc. v. Aerogadget LLC et al
Plaintiff: Klein Tools, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1 to 100, Aerogadget LLC and Abdul Hameed Noor
Case Number: 1:2020cv03856
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #14 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. All pending hearing dates and motions are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice (Claerbaut, W.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Service of Lanham Act Mediation Materials (Claerbaut, W.)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Klein Tools, Inc. as to Abdul Hameed Noor on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Trademark Information).(smm, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 Trademark Request Letter by Klein Tools, Inc. (Claerbaut, W.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial telephonic status hearing set for 9/1/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (bg, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Trademark Request Letter to Plaintiff's counsel. (bg, )
July 1, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Aerogadget LLC, Abdul Hameed Noor (cp, )
July 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Claerbaut, W.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by Jeffrey Thomas Norberg (Norberg, Jeffrey)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Klein Tools, Inc. by W. Rochelle Claerbaut (Claerbaut, W.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Claerbaut, W.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Klein Tools, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17162251.(Claerbaut, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein Tools, Inc. v. Aerogadget LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerogadget LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Hameed Noor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klein Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Norberg
Represented By: W. Rochelle Claerbaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?