Longobardi v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Longobardi
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc., John Crane, Inc., DCO, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Navistar, Inc., Paccar, Inc., CBS Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Cutler-Hammer, Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC, Kenworth Truck Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., Kelsey-Hayes Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, General Electric Company, Peterbilt Motors Company, Union Carbide Corporation, International Truck and Engine Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation and Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv03877
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Clerk of the Court is directed to address Dkt. 24.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400.00, receipt no. 0752-17250457, regarding notice of removal #22 (Harvey, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Correction regarding notice of removal #22 (sxb, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 Entered in Error (Harvey, Shannon) Modified on 7/24/2020 (sxb, ).
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 7/21/2020 to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (smm, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/21/2020. For the reasons set forth below, this suit is remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the remand forthwith. The 7/22/2020 status hearing #7 is stricken. Civil case remanded.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM text entry,, #10 by Pamela Longobardi Addressing the Status of Illinois Defendant Navistar Inc. and its Import Under 28 U.S.C. 1441 (b)(2) (Wilke, Tyler)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Honeywell International, Inc. Jurisdictional Memoranda (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Harvey, Shannon)
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi by Jennifer Hendrix Gelman (Gelman, Jennifer)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DCO, LLC by Anthony David Danhelka (Danhelka, Anthony)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Matthew J O'Malley (O'Malley, Matthew)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Mark I. Tivin (Tivin, Mark)
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Pamela Rose Gamble (Gamble, Pamela)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 NEW PARTIES: Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC, CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation, Cummins, Inc., Eaton Corporation f/k/a Cutler-Hammer, Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, General Electric Company, Kelsey-Hayes Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation, Navistar, Inc., f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation, Paccar, Inc., a/k/a Kenworth Truck Company a/k/a Peterbilt Motors Company, Pneumo Abex Corporation and Union Carbide Corporation added to case caption. (Johnson, Jennifer)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi by Tyler Wilke (Wilke, Tyler)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The jurisdictional addendum #9 showing, at least for pleading purposes, that the parties are completely diverse, the order to show cause #7 is discharged. By 7/17/2020, Plaintiff and Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. shall file simultaneous memoranda addressing: (1) whether Navistar Inc. had been formally dismissed from this suit at the time the suit was removed from state court; and (2) if not, whether 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) requires that the suit be remanded to state court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Addendum by Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Harvey, Shannon)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (lma, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendant Honeywell International Inc. is ordered to show cause by 7/15/2020 why this case should not be remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County. The notice of removal #1 premises jurisdiction on the diversity statute, 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), but it does not properly allege the citizenship of Defendant DCO, LLC. Defendant Honeywell may discharge this order by filing a Jurisdictional Addendum that properly alleges the citizenship of Defendant DCO, LLC. Failure to comply will result in the remand of this case to state court. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Honeywell International, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Johnson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Jennifer Lynn Smith (Smith, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Shannon M. Harvey (Harvey, Shannon)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Jennifer Jerit Johnson (Johnson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Johnson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 002580) filed by Honeywell International, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17166558. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Johnson, Jennifer)
July 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longobardi v. Honeywell International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Mark I. Tivin
Represented By: Pamela Rose Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Represented By: Anthony David Danhelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Jerit Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Smith
Represented By: Shannon M. Harvey
Represented By: Matthew J O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Longobardi
Represented By: Tyler Wilke
Represented By: Jennifer Hendrix Gelman
Represented By: Ethan Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?