IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC v. Seymour
Plaintiff: IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC
Defendant: Charles Scott Seymour
Case Number: 1:2020cv03881
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal #7 , this action is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC (Kolb, Andrew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/1/2020 at 9:30 a.m via teleconference. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/25/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC by Jeffery D. Jeep (Jeep, Jeffery)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kolb, Andrew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC by Andrew Eugene Kolb (Kolb, Andrew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17167160. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - M)(Kolb, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC v. Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOV 1341 Jarvis Saginaw, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Eugene Kolb
Represented By: Jeffery D. Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Scott Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?