Jacob Daneshrad et al v. Trean Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Daneshrad, Jacob Daneshrad and Hasson Blurfrushan
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive, Trean Group, LLC, Nancy Stubenrauch and Mark Frantz
Case Number: 1:2020cv03887
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC (Sosnicki, Lukas)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC by Lukas Sosnicki (Sosnicki, Lukas)
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiffs' motion to appear pro hac vice #25 is granted. Attorney Joseph Daneshrad is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiffs. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17219079. (daneshrad, joseph)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' motion to appear pro hac vice #22 is granted. Attorney Lukas Sosnicki is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Defendants Trean Group, LLC, Nancy Stubenrauch, and Mark Frantz. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/23/20. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17180491. (Sosnicki, Lukas)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-02210. (nsf)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: GRANTING #10 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of Illinois, Chicago. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois #10 filed by Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. (Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Rules 12(B)7, 8(A), and 12(B)(6) #9 filed by Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. (Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TRANSFER Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois #10 filed by Plaintiffs Hasson Blurfrushan, Jacob Daneshrad, Joseph Daneshrad. (Daneshrad, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Rules 12(B)7, 8(A), and 12(B)(6) #9 filed by Plaintiffs Hasson Blurfrushan, Jacob Daneshrad, Joseph Daneshrad. (Daneshrad, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order, #8 . THIS ORDER WAS DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. THE FINAL PRE-TRIAL HEARING DATE HAS BEEN TERMINATED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois #10 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Rules 12(B)7, 8(A), and 12(B)(6) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Nancy Stubenrauch in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois #10 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Rules 12(B)7, 8(A), and 12(B)(6) #9 filed by Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois filed by Defendant Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case under Rules 12(B)7, 8(A), and 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/20/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY by Judge Terry J. Hatter: It is Ordered that all discovery matters which become at issue are referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott her/his consideration. Please contact the courtroom deputy clerk to the Magistrate Judge regarding these matters. It is Ordered, pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rule 16, that the Final Pre-Trial Conference is placed on the Courts calendar for August 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 9B in the U. S. Courthouse on First Street. See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at:yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. COUNSEL: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. See order for further details. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Disclosure #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 3. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Daneshrad, Hasson Blurfrushan, Joseph Daneshrad, upon Defendant Mark Frantz served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. In compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Daneshrad, Hasson Blurfrushan, Joseph Daneshrad, upon Defendant Nancy Stubenrauch served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. In compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jacob Daneshrad, Hasson Blurfrushan, Joseph Daneshrad, upon Defendant Trean Group, LLC served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nancy Stubenrauch, Agent for Service of Process for Trean Group, LLC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. Filed by Plaintiffs Jacob Daneshrad, Hasson Blurfrushan, Joseph Daneshrad. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed as INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC (Sosnicki, Lukas) Modified on 3/9/2020 (lh). [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mark Frantz, Nancy Stubenrauch, Trean Group, LLC. (Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STVC46170 Receipt No: ACACDC-25643102 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mark Frantz, Trean Group, LLC, Nancy Stubenrauch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference, #5 Exhibit Order to Show Cause Hearing, #6 Exhibit Proofs of Service of Summons) (Attorney Lukas Sosnicki added to party Mark Frantz(pty:dft), Attorney Lukas Sosnicki added to party Nancy Stubenrauch(pty:dft), Attorney Lukas Sosnicki added to party Trean Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Sosnicki, Lukas) [Transferred from California Central on 7/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacob Daneshrad et al v. Trean Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Daneshrad
Represented By: Joseph Daneshrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Daneshrad
Represented By: Joseph Daneshrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasson Blurfrushan
Represented By: Joseph Daneshrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trean Group, LLC
Represented By: Lukas Sosnicki
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Stubenrauch
Represented By: Lukas Sosnicki
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Frantz
Represented By: Lukas Sosnicki
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?