Ashley v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathleen Ashley
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv03978
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Referring Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone status hearing set for 9/11/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: The defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time in which to answer and file a certified copy of the administrative record #9 is granted. Answer and record are due November 9, 2020. Mailed notice (yt)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Social Security Administration for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Przywara, Kathleen)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey Cole pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/14/2020. (nsf, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Przywara, Kathleen)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Kathleen M. Przywara as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Social Security Administration (Przywara, Kathleen)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion for leave to appear #3 is granted. The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 9/11/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/4/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket)
July 8, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Kathleen Ashley for leave to appear as (Good, Neil)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Good, Neil)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Ashley; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17182996.(Good, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Kathleen M. Przywara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Ashley
Represented By: Neil H. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?