Coleman v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Micah Coleman
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2020cv04100
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM. The status hearing will proceed by telephone conference. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Micah Coleman by Caitlin Karen Cervenka (Cervenka, Caitlin)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart by Kathleen Cunniff Ori (mc, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of County, case number (2020 L 004134) filed by Cook County, Illinois, Thomas J. Dart Filing fee $ 400.00 (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal) (mc, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Coleman
Represented By: Caitlin Karen Cervenka
Represented By: Marni J. Willenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart
Represented By: Kathleen Cunniff Ori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Kathleen Cunniff Ori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?