UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Funds in the amount of $50,000 in United States currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $50,000 in United States currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv04109
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATED Decree of Forfeiture signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/10/2020. Motion hearing set for 9/14/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice(lk, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Julia Kathryn Schwartz for presentment of motion for forfeiture of property #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schwartz, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for forfeiture of property Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Decree of Forfeiture (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Publication, #2 Exhibit B: Stipulated Agreement)(Schwartz, Julia)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to funds in the amount of $50,000 in United States currency as of 11/08/2019 (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM,WARRANT issued as to FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $50,000.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (nsf, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Julia Kathryn Schwartz as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schwartz, Julia)
July 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT U.S. v. Funds in the Amount of $50,000 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; (Schwartz, Julia)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Julia)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schwartz, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Funds in the amount of $50,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $50,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?