Torres et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rosee Torres and Noel Torres
Defendant: Mrcapitol Group, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Robert Metz, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Intercounty Judicial Sales Corp.,, Mr. Capitol Group. LLC, Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC, Joel Knosher, Ewdard Peterka, Mr Capitol Group, LLC and Edward Peterka
Case Number: 1:2020cv04138
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Joel Knosher, Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC, Edward Peterka in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Foreclosure Complaint, #2 Exhibit Foreclosure Docket, #3 Exhibit First Amended Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Notice of Service of Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit Order on Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit Bankruptcy Docket, #9 Exhibit Bankruptcy Appellate Docket, #10 Exhibit Bankruptcy Brief, #11 Exhibit Bankruptcy Appeal Dismissal, #12 Exhibit Federal Complaint - 1.7.19, #13 Exhibit Order Dismissing 1.7.19 Federal Complaint, #14 Exhibit Federal Complaint - 10.1.19, #15 Exhibit Order Dismissing 10.1.19 Federal Complaint)(Richardson, Matthew)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Joel Knosher, Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC, Edward Peterka (Richardson, Matthew)
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiffs' response to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's motion to dismiss #16 is due 9/28/20, Defendants' reply due 10/19/20. This schedule remains the same for any motion to dismiss filed. The court will rule by mail. (dm, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(Sowka, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland:Defendants Manley Deas Kochaski, LLC, Joel Knosher, Edward Peterka's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #14 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by August 31, 2020. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Joel Knosher, Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC, Edward Peterka for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint (Richardson, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Appearance by Robert Metz, Mr Capitol Group, LLC (Metz, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC (Richardson, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Joel Knosher, Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC, Edward Peterka by Matthew John Richardson (Richardson, Matthew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 9/28/20, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #7 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by August 27, 2020. Mailed notice. (dm, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Paul John Yovanic, Jr (Yovanic, Paul)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint (Sowka, James)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Sowka, James)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by James B. Sowka (Sowka, James)
July 16, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Joel Knosher, Mr Capitol Group, LLC, Edward Peterka (nsf, )
July 16, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Joel Knosher, Mr Capitol Group, LLC, Ewdard Peterka (jg, )
July 14, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Robert Metz, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (jg, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Noel Torres, Rosee Torres; Jury Demand. (Exhibits)(nsf, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrcapitol Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul John Yovanic, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Sowka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Metz
Represented By: Robert T. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercounty Judicial Sales Corp.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Capitol Group. LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manley Dea & Kochalski, LLC
Represented By: Matthew John Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Knosher
Represented By: Matthew John Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewdard Peterka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Capitol Group, LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Peterka
Represented By: Matthew John Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosee Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?