Fiallo v. Brewdog Brewing Company LLC
Plaintiff: Holger Fiallo
Defendant: BREWDOG BREWING COMPANY LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04141
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Brewdog Brewing Company LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Carter, Julius)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #6 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/11/2020. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Brewdog Brewing Company LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Carter, Julius)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brewdog Brewing Company LLC by Julius Carter (Carter, Julius)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holger Fiallo as to Brewdog Brewing Company LLC on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Sweet, Benjamin)
July 16, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Brewdog Brewing Company LLC (gw, )
July 14, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Holger Fiallo by Benjamin Sweet (Sweet, Benjamin)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Holger Fiallo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17215564. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweet, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiallo v. Brewdog Brewing Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BREWDOG BREWING COMPANY LLC
Represented By: Julius Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holger Fiallo
Represented By: Benjamin Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?